This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:22:39 (UTC).

GUADALUPE REYES -V- DILLON TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 GUADALUPE REYES -V- DILLON TRANSPORTATION was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1463

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUADALUPE REYES

Defendants

WILLIAMS NOAH GLENN

DILLON TRANSPORARTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MIRROKNIAN LAWFIRM, PC

15260 Ventura Blvd, Ste 1740

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorney

HARRINGTON FOXX DUBROW & CANTER

333 South Hope Street Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DILLON TRANSPORARTION SERVED ON 12/11/17 WITH FEES OF $270.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DILLON TRANSPORARTION SERVED ON 12/11/17 WITH FEES OF $270.00.

ANSWER FILED BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARRINGTON FOXX DUBROW & CANTER.

ANSWER FILED BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARRINGTON FOXX DUBROW & CANTER.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0897 $435.00; 171030-0897-VS Reference Number 022918

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER VIVIAN TRISTAN 14244; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ARAKSYA BOYADZHYAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GUADALUPE REYES.; ATTORNEY KARINA M. LOBETO PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPRESENTS THAT DEFENDANT WILLIAMS NOAH GLENN HAS BEEN EVADING SERVICE AND; WILL PROCEED WITH A AN APPLICATION TO SERVE BY PUBLICATION.; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; CASE REFERRED TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WEEK; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/01/18 AT 9:00 IN DEPARTMENT S28 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE; CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR; TO HEARING); COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GUADALUPE REYES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR GUADALUPE REYES.; Minutes; Receipt: 180615-0784 $150.00; 180615-0784-CK Reference Number CK 39443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ARAKSYA BOYADZHYAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GUADALUPE REYES.; ATTORNEY ADAM BYRNE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 06/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DILLON TRANSPORARTION.; Minutes; Receipt: 180123-0059 $150.00; 180123-0059-CK Reference Number 3454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 180123-0061 $435.00; 180123-0061-CK Reference Number 93454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DEFENDANT DILLON TRANSPORARTION FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HARRINGTON FOXX DUBROW & CANTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DILLON TRANSPORARTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DILLON TRANSPORARTION SERVED ON 12/11/17 WITH FEES OF $270.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0897 $435.00; 171030-0897-VS Reference Number 022918

    Read MoreRead Less