This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:20:31 (UTC).

GU VS SARWAR

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 GU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SARWAR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7486

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRACE GU

Defendants

ALEX HASAN SARWAR

RACHIDA EL FRIMI

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO RACHIDA EL FRIMI. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO RACHIDA EL FRIMI. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0357 $75.00; 170927-0357-VS Reference Number 031-0046557389

SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF GRACE GU.

SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF GRACE GU.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ALEX HASAN SARWAR. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ALEX HASAN SARWAR. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:57; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; RACHIDA EL FRIMI REPRESENTED BY ALEX SARWAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER LEI ARELLANO IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET MANDARIAN/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 301878 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; CASE HEARD CONCURRENTLY WITH CASE SMCFS1708550.; WITNESS -- GRACE GU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- ALEX SARWAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 11:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:20; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER YANYAN LIU IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET MANDARIN/ENGLISH FOR MANDARIN. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 301879 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THIS CASE (SMCFS1707486) AND CASE NUMBER SMCFS1707485 TO BE CONSOLIDATED,; WITHCASE NUMBER SMCFS1707486 TO BE THE LEAD CASE.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE THE CASES; WITNESS -- GRACE GU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- ALEX SAMAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER SO THAT IT MAY BE HEARD WITH RELATED CASE NUMBER SMCFS1708550.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/07/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE SMCFS1707485 AND SMCFS1707486; 10:52; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; INTERPRETER COORDINATOR NOTIFIED THAT MANDARIN INTERPRETER INTERPRETER IS NEEDED AT NEXT HEARING (FONTANA).; ACTION - COMPLETE

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NEED MANDARIAN INTERPRETER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/13/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 11:05; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; RULING NOT RECORDED; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF GRACE GU ORDERED ENTERED 03/01/18; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR, RACHIDA EL FRIMI; AND AGAINST GRACE GU; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:57; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; RACHIDA EL FRIMI REPRESENTED BY ALEX SARWAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER LEI ARELLANO IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET MANDARIAN/ENGLISH FOR PLAINTIFF. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 301878 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; CASE HEARD CONCURRENTLY WITH CASE SMCFS1708550.; WITNESS -- GRACE GU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- ALEX SARWAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 11:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:09; SHANNON L FAHERTY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; RACHIDA EL FRIMI REPRESENTED BY ALEX SARWAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: JUDGE SINFIELD NOT AVAILABLE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/28/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 10:12; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ALEX HASAN SARWAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:20; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER YANYAN LIU IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET MANDARIN/ENGLISH FOR MANDARIN. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 301879 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THIS CASE (SMCFS1707486) AND CASE NUMBER SMCFS1707485 TO BE CONSOLIDATED,; WITHCASE NUMBER SMCFS1707486 TO BE THE LEAD CASE.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE THE CASES; WITNESS -- GRACE GU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- ALEX SAMAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER SO THAT IT MAY BE HEARD WITH RELATED CASE NUMBER SMCFS1708550.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/07/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE SMCFS1707485 AND SMCFS1707486; 10:52; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; INTERPRETER COORDINATOR NOTIFIED THAT MANDARIN INTERPRETER INTERPRETER IS NEEDED AT NEXT HEARING (FONTANA).; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Minutes; SMALL CLAIMS HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLA; REASON: NEED MANDARIN INTERPRETER CASE CONSOLIDATED. SEE FILE FOR DETAILED MINUTE; ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALEX HASAN SARWAR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NEED MANDARIAN INTERPRETER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/13/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 11:05; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ALEX HASAN SARWAR. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO ALEX HASAN SARWAR. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO RACHIDA EL FRIMI. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRACE GU FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 171010-0548 $12.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRACE GU FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0358 $2.50; 170927-0358-VS Reference Number 031-0046557389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0357 $75.00; 170927-0357-VS Reference Number 031-0046557389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF GRACE GU.

    Read MoreRead Less