This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:20:12 (UTC).

MASTER FILE SMCFS1707486 GU -V- SARWAR

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 MASTER FILE SMCFS1707486 GU -V- SARWAR was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7485

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRACE GU

Defendant

RACHIDA EL FRIMI

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RACHIDA EL FRIMI. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RACHIDA EL FRIMI. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF RACHIDA EL FRIMI FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF RACHIDA EL FRIMI FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; ALEX SARWAR ON BEHALF OF RACHIDA EL FRIMI PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:20; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER YANYAN LIU IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET MANDARIN/ENGLISH FOR MANDARIN. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 301879 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THIS CASE (SMCFS1707485) AND CASE NUMBER SMCFS1707486 TO BE CONSOLIDATED,; WITH CASE NUMBER SMCFS1707486 TO BE THE LEAD CASE.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE THE CASES.; WITNESS -- GRACE GU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- ALEX SAMAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER SO THAT IT MAY BE HEARD WITH RELATED CASE NUMBER SMCFS1708550.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/07/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; INTERPRETER COORDINATOR NOTIFIED THAT MANDARIN INTERPRETER IS NEEDED AT NEXT HEARING (FONTANA).; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE SMCFS1707485 AND SCMFS1707486; 10:52; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT RACHIDA EL FRIMI PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: FOR MANDARIAN INTERPRETER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/13/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; COURT WILL ALLOW DEFENDANTS HUSBAND ALEX SARWAR TO APPEAR FOR HER AT NEXT HEARING. HE IS; DEFENDANT IN RELATED CASE SMCFS1707485.; 11:05; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0368 $75.00; 170927-0368-VS Reference Number 031-0046557389

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF RACHIDA EL FRIMI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) SMCFS1707486 MASTER FILE SMCFS1707486; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; ALEX SARWAR ON BEHALF OF RACHIDA EL FRIMI PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:20; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER YANYAN LIU IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET MANDARIN/ENGLISH FOR MANDARIN. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER 301879 HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; THE INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; THE COURT ORDERS THAT THIS CASE (SMCFS1707485) AND CASE NUMBER SMCFS1707486 TO BE CONSOLIDATED,; WITH CASE NUMBER SMCFS1707486 TO BE THE LEAD CASE.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE THE CASES.; WITNESS -- GRACE GU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; WITNESS -- ALEX SAMAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER SO THAT IT MAY BE HEARD WITH RELATED CASE NUMBER SMCFS1708550.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/07/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; INTERPRETER COORDINATOR NOTIFIED THAT MANDARIN INTERPRETER IS NEEDED AT NEXT HEARING (FONTANA).; CLERK'S OFFICE TO CONSOLIDATE SMCFS1707485 AND SCMFS1707486; 10:52; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:55; TONY RAPHAEL, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRACE GU PRESENT; DEFENDANT RACHIDA EL FRIMI PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: FOR MANDARIAN INTERPRETER; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/13/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE; COURT WILL ALLOW DEFENDANTS HUSBAND ALEX SARWAR TO APPEAR FOR HER AT NEXT HEARING. HE IS; DEFENDANT IN RELATED CASE SMCFS1707485.; 11:05; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO RACHIDA EL FRIMI. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRACE GU FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0372 $2.50; 170927-0372-VS Reference Number 031-0046557389

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0368 $75.00; 170927-0368-VS Reference Number 031-0046557389

    Read MoreRead Less