This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 12:05:49 (UTC).

GRINDLE-V-REDLANDS COMMUNITY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 GRINDLE-V-REDLANDS COMMUNITY was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5759

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAIL GRINDLE

Defendant

REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MYERS LAW GROUP

9327 Fairway View Place Ste 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GAIL GRINDLE.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GAIL GRINDLE.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY GAIL GRINDLE

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY GAIL GRINDLE

ANSWER FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL SERVED ON 10/14/16 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL SERVED ON 10/14/16 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JUSTIN M CRANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; KRISTALYN F LEE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REQUEST CONTINUANCE. FUNDING NOT COMPLETE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • HEARING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION/FURTHER TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JUSTIN M CRANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RACHEL J LEE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE MATTER SETTLED ON 12/1/17. COUNSEL REQUEST ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 02/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL.; Minutes; Receipt: 171117-0783 $150.00; 171117-0783-CK Reference Number 121819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JUSTIN CRANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY SUZETTY SHEN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT INQUIRES WITH COUNSEL AS TO THE STATUS OF PRIVVATE MEDIATION. COUNSEL INFORM THE COURT; OF THEIR INTENT TO ATTEND PRIVATE MEDIATION IN LATE OCTOBER TO EARLY NOVEMBER.; THE COURT CONTINUES THE MATTER FOR PARTIES TO ATTEND PRIVATE MEDIATION.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION/FURTHER TSC SET FOR 12/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JUSTINE CRANE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY SUZETTY SHEN PRESENT FOR DEF REDLANDS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL ELECT TO POSSIBLE PRIVATE MEDIATION/FURTHER DISCOVERY NEEDED; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161122-0971 $435.00; 161122-0971-CK Reference Number 110887

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GAIL GRINDLE FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 161026-0562 $3.68; 161026-0562-MC Reference Number 0310000315132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO REDLANDS COMMUNITYHOSPITAL SERVED ON 10/14/16 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GAIL GRINDLE FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 160923-0502 $435.00; 160923-0502-CK Reference Number 4321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.