This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/06/2018 at 10:01:57 (UTC).

GRIMMETT -V- ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 12/28/2016 GRIMMETT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDERSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0499

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVE GRIMMETT

Defendant

JOSEPH ANDERSON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT LEFT AT COUNTER FOR PICK UP)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT LEFT AT COUNTER FOR PICK UP)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/28/16 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/28/16 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECL OF J. ANDERSON BY MAIL ON 01/16/17 AS TO DAVE GRIMITT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECL OF J. ANDERSON BY MAIL ON 01/16/17 AS TO DAVE GRIMITT, FILED.

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH ANDERSON FILED

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH ANDERSON FILED

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSEPH ANDERSON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSEPH ANDERSON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161228-0567 $255.00; 161228-0567-CK Reference Number 1179

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170201-0364 $25.00; 170201-0364-CK Reference Number 1180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT LEFT AT COUNTER FOR PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $23.33.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/28/16 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JOSEPH ANDERSON IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JOSEPH ANDERSON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JOSEPH ANDERSON; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • ADA MEMO SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161228-0567 $255.00; 161228-0567-CK Reference Number 1179

    Read MoreRead Less