This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 06:10:41 (UTC).

GREENBRIAR VS RODGERS

Case Summary

On 01/28/2011 GREENBRIAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RODGERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0064

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREENBRIAR APARTMENT

Defendants

MONIQUE RODGERS

TREMAINE RODGERS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN E BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Defendant Attorney

KAPLAN LEE LLP

725 S Figueroa St Ste 3230

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2012
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 120404-2220 $49.00; 120404-2220-CK Reference Number 1908

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2011
  • MOTION RE: CASE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GREENBRIAR APARTMENT; DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 08:50; COURT FINDS:; PLAINTIFF WAS SERVED WITH NOTICE OF HEARING OF MOTION.; TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS'S MOTION FOR DISMISSAL IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/28/2011 OF GREENBRIAR APARTMENT.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/28/2011 OF GREENBRIAR APARTMENT ORDERED SET ASIDE.; ON DEFENDANTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; COPY OF MINUTE ORDER PROVIDED TO DEFENDANT.; ; ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY J.FRANCIS; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: DISMISS WITH PREDJUDICE INSTEAD OF WITHOUT ==; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 09/12/11 ====

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE:MOTION FOR CASE DISMISSAL WITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • MOTION RE: CASE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: F. JOLLEVET; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GREENBRIAR APARTMENT; DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; IT DOES NOT APPEAR THAT PLAINTIFF WAS SERVED WITH NOTICE OF TODAYS HEARING. COURT CONTINUES; HEARING AND ORDERS DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE PROOF THAT PLAINTIFF IS PERSONALLY SERVED NO LATER; THAN 4:00 P.M. ON 9/7/11 WITH NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/09/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY DEFENDANT AND CLERKS OFFICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • MOTION RE: CASE DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SENT IN SASE TO ATTY BOUZANE); Minutes; Receipt: 110609-4445 $25.00; 110609-4445-CK Reference Number 177062

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY HELEN LONG PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY YITZ WEISS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; COURT HAS READ AND CONSIDERED MOVING AND OPPOSING PAPERS RE: DEFENDANTS APPLICATION FOR ORDER; DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION.; TREMAINE RODGERS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANTS.; WITNESS TREMAINE RODGERS EXCUSED.; MARLO CALDERON IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; WITNESS MARLO CALDERON EXCUSED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENSE COUNSEL .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL .; 11:00; COURT IN RECESS.; RECESS TAKEN FOR DEFENDANT TO GO AND GET CASH PAYMENT.; 11:42; COURT RECONVENES ALL PARTIES PRESENT; DEFENDANT RETURNS WITH FULL PAYMENT IN CASH.; ON THE CONDITION THAT DEFENDANT PAYS $1250.00 FORTHWITH IN CASH TO PLAINTIFF:; TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS'S MOTION FOR ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSI IS GRANTED.; WRIT NOT ISSUED.; MATTER TO PROCEED ON STIPULATED JUDGMENT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KAPLAN LEE LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110209-0694 $20.00; 110209-0694-CK Reference Number 169932

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS; BAILIFF: J. COLLINS; NOT REPORTED; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LESLIE BORN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS PRESENT; ATTORNEY YITZ E. WEISS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS'S MOTION TO TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS IS HEARD.; MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF THE IS GRANTED.; NEW SERVICE REQUIRED ON BOTH DEFENDANTS.; PROPOSED ANSWER IN FILED RETURNED TO DEFENDANTS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110202-0190 $255.00; 110202-0190-CK Reference Number 169218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/28/2011 OF GREENBRIAR APARTMENT FOR TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS, ATTORNEY KAPLAN LEE LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • MOTION RE: TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT TREMAINE RODGERS, MONIQUE RODGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.