This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:57:22 (UTC).

GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE-V-CONEY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE-V-CONEY was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1675

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AMANDA E CONEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,595.17

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,595.17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 07/27/16; JUDGMENT FOR: GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMANDA E CONEY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,022.89 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $252.28 COSTS $320.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,595.17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMANDA E CONEY.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMANDA E CONEY.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ORIGINAL DOCS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ORIGINAL DOCS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 1033 FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 1033 FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMANDA E CONEY SERVED ON 02/25/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMANDA E CONEY SERVED ON 02/25/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,595.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ORIGINAL DOCS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 07/27/16; JUDGMENT FOR: GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMANDA E CONEY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,022.89 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $252.28 COSTS $320.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,595.17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT CCP 1033 FILED BY GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMANDA E CONEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/01/2016 OF GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY AS TO AMANDA E CONEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO AMANDA E CONEY SERVED ON 02/25/16 WITH FEES OF $80.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,022.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 02/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREAT AMERICAN FINANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160209-0309 $240.00; 160209-0309-CK Reference Number 668643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less