This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:36:28 (UTC).

GRANADA VILLAS VS BAUTISTA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 GRANADA VILLAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAUTISTA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8341

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANADA VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

MARIA E BAUTISTA

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0933 $50.00; 171030-0933-CK Reference Number 11618

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIA E BAUTISTA. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIA E BAUTISTA. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF GRANADA VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; GRANADA VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION REPRESENTED BY ROBERT REMLEY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MARIA E BAUTISTA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:52; MARIA E BAUTISTA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ROBERT REMLEY IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARIA E BAUTISTA.; JUDGMENT FOR: GRANADA VILLAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA E BAUTISTA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,675.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 11:55; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIA E BAUTISTA. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0933 $50.00; 171030-0933-CK Reference Number 11618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less