This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/05/2018 at 22:22:07 (UTC).

GRAMAJO V. BECERRA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 GRAMAJO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BECERRA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1150

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERWIN GRAMAJO

Defendants

JUAN JOSE WILLIE

CLAUDIA BECERRA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL MARQUEZ

1605 W Olympic Blvd Ste 515

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ERWIN GRAMAJO FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • ANSWER FILED BY CLAUDIA BECERRA, JUAN JOSE WILLIE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DANIEL MARQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CLAUDIA BECERRA, JUAN JOSE WILLIE FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH DANIEL MARQUEZ AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR JUAN JOSE WILLIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH DANIEL MARQUEZ AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CLAUDIA BECERRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110620-2861 $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: AMBER ANDERSON; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ERWIN GRAMAJO; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CLAUDIA BECERRA, JUAN JOSE WILLIE; PROCEEDINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 08/19/11 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCRU; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CLAUDIA BECERRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110512-2142 $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ERWIN GRAMAJO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2011
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ERWIN GRAMAJO FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT CCRU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $5,550.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ERWIN GRAMAJO.

    Read MoreRead Less