This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 07:24:25 (UTC).

GRAMAJO-V-ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 GRAMAJO-V-ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2160

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDRES GRAMAJO

Defendant

ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DESJARDINS & PANITZ, LLP

210 West Birch Street Suite 202

Brea, CA 92821

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/12/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/12/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

ANSWER FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2017
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER OTHER ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • HEARING RE: RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION/FURTHER TRIAL SETTIN; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ANDRES GRAMAJO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON 04/12/17 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN M PACHECO, JUDGE; CLERK: SUZANNE M SERRANO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT C SHELBY; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL DESJARDINS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; SARA POGGI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL ELECT TO PRIVATE MEDIATION; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: RETURN FROM PRIVATE MEDIATION/FURTHER TRIAL SETTIN SET FOR 09/11/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2017
  • DEFENDANT ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP, FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP, FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170202-0125 $435.00; 170202-0125-CK Reference Number 112839

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALLIED WEST PAPER CORP,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/10/17 WITH COSTS OF $90.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANDRES GRAMAJO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 161230-0301 $435.00; 161230-0301-CK Reference Number 3143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less