This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 14:28:52 (UTC).

GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC -V- WEST

Case Summary

On 07/22/2015 GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEST. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5708

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC

Defendant

KENNETH WEST

 

Court Documents

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.80

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.80

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.80

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.80

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.80

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $82.80

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180622-0661 $25.00; 180622-0661-MC Reference Number 031-0124481695

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $260.82 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $115.41

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $260.82 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $115.41

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 751.19 (MAILED BACK) ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 751.19 (MAILED BACK) ) (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $260.82) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $105.37)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $260.82) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $105.37)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $195.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $77.70

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $195.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $77.70

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171106-0471 $60.00; 171106-0471-VS Reference Number 031-0057654970

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/01/17 AS TO KENNETH WEST, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC SUBPOENA BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 10/01/17 AS TO KENNETH WEST, FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170920-0507 $60.00

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $18.10

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $18.10

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:21; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC REPRESENTED BY HARRIS HALL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KENNETH WEST; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; KENNETH WEST HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; HARRIS HALL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KENNETH WEST.; JUDGMENT FOR: GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH WEST; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $315.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $45.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $360.00; 10:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO KENNETH WEST; PARTY SERVED ON 07/30/15 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO KENNETH WEST; PARTY SERVED ON 07/30/15 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150723-1802 $30.00

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180622-0661 $25.00; 180622-0661-MC Reference Number 031-0124481695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $260.82 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $115.41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0356 $25.00; 180517-0356-MC Reference Number 0310113593702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FOR FAX/FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0361 $7.00; 180517-0361-MC Reference Number 0310113593702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0354 $7.00; 180517-0354-MC Reference Number 031-0113592751

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 751.19 (MAILED BACK) ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • MEMO OF COST IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PAGE 2 IS INCOMPLETE/ON WRIT LINE 11 MUST MATCH ORIGINAL JUDGMENT TOTAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $260.82) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $105.37)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • MEMO/WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:21; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC REPRESENTED BY HARRIS HALL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KENNETH WEST; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; KENNETH WEST HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; HARRIS HALL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST KENNETH WEST.; JUDGMENT FOR: GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KENNETH WEST; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $315.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $45.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $360.00; 10:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FOR PLAINTIFF; Minutes; Receipt: 150814-1034 $70.00; 150814-1034-MC Reference Number 027-0233329069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM ISCL TO ISCB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO KENNETH WEST; PARTY SERVED ON 07/30/15 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 150723-2254 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 94B599347V481034H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150723-1802 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less