This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 18:16:26 (UTC).

GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC -V- DUNAGAN

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUNAGAN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6629

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC

Defendant

JUSTIN M DUNAGAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $141.90 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.80 (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $141.90 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.80 (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180328-0342 $25.00

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $71.90) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $88.35), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $71.90) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $88.35), AND

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC.

NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC.

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; KYLE S BRODIE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R BEARDSLEE; APPEARANCES:; GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC REPRESENTED BY MARINE KHACHERYAN.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:58; JUSTIN M DUNAGAN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; MARINE KHACHERYAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JUSTIN M DUNAGAN.; JUDGMENT FOR: GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $215.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $45.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $260.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 11:59; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; PARTY SERVED ON 08/30/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; PARTY SERVED ON 08/30/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150821-2113 $100.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • POS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO DATE OF MAILING SEE HIGHLIGHTED AREA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $141.90 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.80 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( WRIT ISSUED OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180328-0342 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $71.90) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $88.35), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • PARTY GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC UPDATED: PLAINTIFFS ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • BENCH WARRANT RETURNED FROM SHERIFFS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; KYLE S BRODIE, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: R BEARDSLEE; APPEARANCES:; GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC REPRESENTED BY MARINE KHACHERYAN.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:58; JUSTIN M DUNAGAN HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; MARINE KHACHERYAN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST JUSTIN M DUNAGAN.; JUDGMENT FOR: GRAHAM-NEWMAN LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $215.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $45.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $260.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 11:59; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • CERT MAIL RECEIPT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO JUSTIN M DUNAGAN; PARTY SERVED ON 08/30/15 WITH COSTS OF $15.00 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO EACH DEFENDANT.; Minutes; Receipt: 150821-2117 $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 150821-2113 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 38V7637649103844X

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.