This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:35:09 (UTC).

GRACIELA VALLEJO -N- MIGUEL A. VALLEJO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 GRACIELA VALLEJO -N- MIGUEL A VALLEJO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0967

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRACIELA VALLEJO

Respondent

MIGUEL A VALLEJO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MIGUEL A VALLEJO FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MIGUEL A VALLEJO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MIGUEL A VALLEJO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY MIGUEL A VALLEJO FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE, I&E BY PERSONAL ON 03/24/17 AS TO GRACIELA VALLEJO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF GRACIELA VALLEJO BY MIGUEL A VALLEJO FILED. REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRACIELA VALLEJO FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170316-0604 $6.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MIGUEL A VALLEJO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GRACIELA VALLEJO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GRACIELA VALLEJO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GRACIELA VALLEJO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S47

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.