Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 10:17:17 (UTC).

GOULD -V- CALIF. DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

Case Summary

On 08/26/2010 GOULD filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CALIF DEPT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9426

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

RENESTO JUSTINIANE

ALEX MIHALKOVITZ

TIMOTHY GOULD

ERIC NEWTON

ERCELL SELLERS

KELLY GORE

DEMA OSBORN

KIP BROWN

DEBORAH CASTANEDA

FRANK HERNANDEZ

ANTONIO LEMOS

MARCO LEON

OLIVER ALETA

ANNETTE MILES

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Plaintiffs and Appellants

ALEX MIHALKOVITZ

TIMOTHY GOULD

ERIC NEWTON

ERCELL SELLERS

DEMA OSBORN

KIP BROWN

DEBORAH CASTANEDA

FRANK HERNANDEZ

MARCO LEON

OLIVER ALETA

ANNETTE MILES

Defendant and Respondent

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Appellant Attorneys

SANDRA L NOEL

301 9Th Street Ste 101

Redlands, CA 92374

ALICE Q. ROBINSON

110 West A Street, Suite 1100 P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Defendant Attorney

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF CALIFORNIA

600 W. Broadway Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2015
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, FOR 432.30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • APPEAL FILED 08/08/2013 OF TIMOTHY GOULD COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • REMITTITUR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • APPEAL JUDGMENT IS AFFIRMED BY REVIEWING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • REMITTITUR ROUTED TO RANCHO CUCAMONGA FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY RENESTO JUSTINIANE, FRANK HERNANDEZ, KELLY GORE, KIP BROWN, MARCO LEON, OLIVER ALETA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY TIMOTHY GOULD, ALEX MIHALKOVITZ, DEMA OSBORN, ANNETTE MILES, ANTONIO LEMOS, DEBORAH CASTANEDA, ERCELL SELLERS, ERIC NEWTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • DCA ORDER RE APPEAL: APP RQ FOR EXTENSION TO FILE AND SERVE BRIEF IS GRANTED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • DCA ORDER- APPELLANT GRANTED EXT TO SERVE/FILE- REPLY BRIEF- SEE ORDER- PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • RESPONDENTS BRIEF (APPEAL CASE #059461) - PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. PARTY SERVED ON 01/07/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY TIMOTHY GOULD, ALEX MIHALKOVITZ, DEMA OSBORN, ANNETTE MILES, ANTONIO LEMOS, DEBORAH CASTANEDA, ERCELL SELLERS, ERIC NEWTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TIMOTHY GOULD FOR SANCTIONS; Minutes; Receipt: 101202-1152 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: GINA ZAMUDIO; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT P COOPER; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ELLA MURPHY FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; PURSUANT TO RULE 3.110 IN THE AMOUNT OF $100 PAYABLE TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT ON OR BEFORE; 12/27/10.; PLAINTIFF CLAIMS SUMMONS MAILED TO DEFENDANTS COUNSEL WITH NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND; RECEIPT.; PLAINTIFF TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FORTHWITH.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/21/11 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT OF GOULD ET AL IMAGED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 100826-2351 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED AND FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant