This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:49:27 (UTC).

GORMAN-V-CATANZARITE

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 GORMAN-V-CATANZARITE was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3194

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID GORMAN

Defendants

JEFFREY MCCONNELL

KENNETH CATANZARITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS N. JACOBSON

1650 Iowa Ave Suite 190

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant Attorney

CATANZARITE LAW CORPORATION

2331 W Lincoln Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/NTC OF TSC/MOT TO COMPEL BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/16/17 AS TO KENNETH CATANZARITE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT/NTC OF TSC/MOT TO COMPEL BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/16/17 AS TO KENNETH CATANZARITE, FILED.

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT KENNETH CATANZARITE (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS SET FOR HEARING ON 09/18/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT KENNETH CATANZARITE (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JEFFREY MCCONNELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JEFFREY MCCONNELL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KENNETH CATANZARITE SERVED ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO KENNETH CATANZARITE SERVED ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $79.00.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY DAVID GORMAN.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY DAVID GORMAN.

DECLARATION OF THOMAS N JACOBSON FILED

DECLARATION OF THOMAS N JACOBSON FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GORMAN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GORMAN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GORMAN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GORMAN (IMAGED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF DAVID GORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KENNETH CATANZARITE FOR STIP TO CONTINUE; Minutes; Receipt: 180904-0847 $20.00; 180904-0847-CK Reference Number 99507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON HEARING ON 082018 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID GORMAN FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 180822-0138 $3.00; 180822-0138-VS Reference Number 04718D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT JEFFREY MCCONNELL; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY THOMAS N. JACOBSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY BRANDON WOODWARD PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; JEFFREY MCCONNELL'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IS HEARD.; TENTATIVE RULING IS RECITED BY THE COURT.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; JEFFREY MCCONNELL'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS IS DENIED.; (WITH PREJUDICE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT JEFFREY MCCONNELL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • REPLY TO (IN SUPPORT OF) TO MOTION RE: ATTYS FEES SET FOR HEARING ON 08/20/18 FILED BY KENNETH CATANZARITE, JEFFREY MCCONNELL. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO UNAUTHENTICATED AND IRRELEVANT EXHIBITS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KENNETH CATANZARITE FOR FAX, EVP, COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 180813-0775 $28.71; 180813-0775-MC Reference Number 41885P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT KENNETH CATANZARITE, JEFFREY MCCONNELL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF THOMAS N JACOBSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID GORMAN FOR MOTION; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0061 $90.00; 170712-0061-EZ Reference Number 3400L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID GORMAN FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0046 $435.00; 170712-0046-EZ Reference Number 3400L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: COMPEL ARBITRATION SET FOR HEARING ON 09/11/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAVID GORMAN (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less