This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/24/2018 at 10:13:52 (UTC).

GORDON -V- NELSON

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 GORDON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NELSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2576

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA GORDON

Defendants

MICHAEL NELSON

TONJA STEWART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEAR AND ASSOCIATES ATTORNEY

Po Box 1402

Loma Linda, CA 93254

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ROBYN S HOSMER

3780 Kilroy Airport Way #530

Long Beach, CA 90806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2013
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/13 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT V9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. (IMAGED); Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL NELSON, TONJA STEWART. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MICHAEL NELSON, TONJA STEWART.; Minutes; Receipt: 120820-1869 $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • POSTING OF JURY FEES IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED AN ADDITIONAL $150 FOR 2 DEFS MICHAEL NELSON AND TONJA STEWART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • NOTICE OF POSTING FEES IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THERE IS NO DEFENDANT ERIC URIAS ON COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS WEAR AND ASSOCIATESATTORNEY FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING MARIA GORDON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO TONJA STEWART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MICHAEL NELSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO TONJA STEWART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MICHAEL NELSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: OF DILIGENCE FILED BY MARIA GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: OF DILIGENCE FILED BY MARIA GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110505-0258 $395.00; 110505-0258-VS Reference Number 024-0120790139

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less