This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/27/2018 at 22:45:51 (UTC).

GORDON -V- KAJIWARA EQUIP

Case Summary

On 07/16/2010 GORDON filed an Other lawsuit against KAJIWARA EQUIP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2067

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON RANCH MARKETPLACE LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARTHUR KAJIWARA

SHARON KAJIWARA

ARTHUR KAJIWARA EQUIPMENT COMPANY INC

ARTHUR KAJIWARA EQUIPMENT COMPANY, INC.

Cross Defendants

QUONG-LEBOWITZ

SUNNY HILLS - PALLADIUM, LLC

GORDON RANCH MARKETPLACE LLC,

PK SALE, LLC

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CALDER & MELLO

319 E Palm Dr Suite D

Placentia, CA 92870

BLACKMAR PRINCIPE & SCHMELTER

600 B Street Suite 2250

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KENNY TAN

640 N. Diamond Bar Blvd

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2014
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; THOMAS S. GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER BETTY KELLEY 3981; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PARTIES.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNOT DISMISS ENTIRE CASE CROSS COMPLAINT STILL ACTIVE MUST OBTAIN SIGNATURES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY GORDON RANCH MARKETPLACE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • CASE IS RE-ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF VIA TELECOM.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL NEEDS TO CONFIRM WITH HIS CLIENT ON THE STATUS OF PAYMENTS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/30/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29J.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • RESCHEDULE OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2010
  • REQ TO SET/DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED 07/16/2010 OF GORDON RANCH MARKETPLACE LLC AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED 07/16/2010 OF GORDON RANCH MARKETPLACE LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/21/10 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • ANSWER FILED BY ARTHUR KAJIWARA EQUIPMENT COMPANY INC, ARTHUR KAJIWARA, SHARON KAJIWARA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KENNY TAN.; Minutes; Receipt: 100804-3735 $1,065.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT >$25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100716-0660 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT CCRU

    Read MoreRead Less