This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 00:56:05 (UTC).

GONZALO CABRAL -N- ANGELICA M. CASAS-CABRAL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 GONZALO CABRAL -N- ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8305

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GONZALO CABRAL

Respondent

ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF AUDREY ORAN

6809 Indiana Ave. Suite 130-B11

Riverside, CA 92506

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO 07/10/18 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL FOR 2 CERT COPIES OF MINUTE ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $54.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • MOTION RE: DECLARATION FOR JOINDER (051818) FILED BY RESPONDENT ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER SOPHIA WISE 12008; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GONZALO CABRAL; RESPONDENT ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL PRESENT; ATTORNEY AUDREY ORAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; GONZALO CABRAL JR. (CLAIMANT) PRESENT.; ATTORNEY FERNANDO BERNHEIM PRESENT FOR GONZALO CABRAL JR..; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; WRITTEN STIPULATION ON SPECIFIC ISSUES AS ATTACHED IS APPROVED BY COURT AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER BY REFERENCE AS THOUGH FULLY SET FORTH HEREIN,AND EACH OF THE PARTIES IS DIRECTED; TO EXECUTE ALL THE PROVISIONS OF THAT ORDER.; THE COMMUNITY INTEREST IN THE SALES PROCEEDS SHALL BE PLACED IN MS. ORANS ATTORNEY CLIENT; TRUST ACCOUNT AND SHALL NOT BE REMOVED WITHOUT A WRITTEN AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES OR FURTHER ORDER; OF THE COURT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • ATTACHMENT TO 06/14/18 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL FOR NOTICE OF PENDENCY IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL RE: TRO/CC/CV/SS/CS/PROPERTY CONTROL (05/03/18); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER SOPHIA WISE 12008; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GONZALO CABRAL; RESPONDENT ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL PRESENT; ATTORNEY AUDREY ORAN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER CARMEN CORTEZ # 301226 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR RESPONDENT. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; WITNESS -- ANGELICA CASAS-CABRAL IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; GONZALO CABRAL IS ORDERED TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT IN THE AMOUNT OF $638.00 EACH MONTH.; PAYABLE ONE-HALF ON THE 1ST AND ONE-HALF ON THE 15TH DAYS OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING 05/15/18 AND CONTINUING UNTIL EACH CHILD DIES, MARRIES, BECOMES EMANCIPATED, REACHES THE AGE OF 18 OR REACHES THE AG; E OF 19 AND IS A FULL-TIME HIGH SCHOOL STUDENT, OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, WHICHEVER FIRST OCCURS.; GONZALO CABRAL IS ORDERED TO PAY AS AND FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT THE SUM OF $172.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLE ONE-HALF ON THE 1ST AND ONE-HALF ON THE 15TH DAYS OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING 05/15/18 AND CONTINUING UN; TIL THE DEATH OF EITHER PARTY, REMARRIAGE OF THE ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL OR:; FURTHER ORDER OF COURT.; SUPPORT FINDINGS ARE SET FORTH ON THE COMPUTER PRINTOUT ATTACHED.; SUPPORT PAYMENTS ORDERED PAID BY WAGE ASSIGNMENT.; THE COURT ORDERS GONZALO CABRAL PROVIDE MEDICAL/DENTAL/VISION INSURANCE, IF AVAILABLE THROUGH HIS/HER EMPLOYMENT AT LOW OR NO COST.; PETITIONER SHALL PAY 50 % AND RESPONDENT SHALL PAY 50 % OF ANY UNREIMBURSED MEDICAL, DENTAL, AND ORTHODONTIA EXPENSE INCURRED ON BEHALF OF THE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN.; RESPONDENT SHALL BE RESPONSIBLE FOR HER OWN CO-PAYMENTS.; THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; SOLE PHYSICAL AND LEGAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN SHALL BE AWARDED TO ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL.; ANY VISITATION BETWEEN PETITIONER AND THE CHILD SHALL BE AS ARRANGED BETWEEN THE PARTIES.; RESPONDENT SHALL HAVE EXCLUSIVE USE AND POSSESSION OF THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 17656; DORSEY AVE., FONTANA, CA 92335 AS WELL AS THE 2006 GMC YUKON.; PETITIONER SHALL BE RESTRAINED FROM SELLING THE REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 17656 DORSEY AVE.,; FONTANA, CA 92335 OR THE 2006 GMC YUKON.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANGELICA M CASAS-CABRAL FOR NOTICE OF PENDENCY IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171019-0343 $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GONZALO CABRAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GONZALO CABRAL IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GONZALO CABRAL FOR FIRST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less