This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:14:14 (UTC).

GONZALEZ-V-JESSUP

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 GONZALEZ-V-JESSUP was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9449

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIO GONZALEZ

Defendants

DUANE JESSUP

DANIEL MORRISSETTE

SARAH JESSUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH D. RYAN

3055 Wilshire Blvd Suite 1120

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:38; COURT NOTES NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT WAS FILED ON 05/18/18.; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE/SETTLEMENT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:39; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARIO GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/SANCTIONS/TSC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:44; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR A FINAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY PREVIOUS SANCTIONS IN THE; AMOUNT OF $140.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC; 3.110(B). ALSO WHY ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS OF $140.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO; APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND FAILURE TO COMPLY; WITH CRC 3.110(B). TOTAL SANCTIONS ARE $280.00.; COURT STATES THAT ANOTHER FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN MATTER BEING DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC SET FOR 06/06/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:47; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:58; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR ORDER SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00; SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSELS FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TODAYS HEARING AND ALSO; $50.00 FOR FAILING TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.110(B). TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS THAT MAY BE IMPOSED IS; $140.00; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF SERVICE/DEFAULT/SANCTIONS/TSC SET FOR 05/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/4/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; 08:58; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARIO GONZALEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0627 $380.00; 171004-0627-CK Reference Number 6314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less