This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:02:45 (UTC).

GONZALEZ-V-COLLETTI

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 GONZALEZ-V-COLLETTI was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9381

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN GONZALEZ

Defendants

MICHAEL AND STEPHANIE COLLETTI

STEPHANIE COLLETTI

MICHAEL COLLETTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AGHABI LAW APC

3450 Wilshire Blvd Suite 304

Los Angeles, CA 90010

LAW OFFICES OF BRADLEY S WALLACE, PC

16000 Ventura Blvd Suite 440

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorney

WADE & LOWE

3200 Inland Empire Boulevard Suite 160

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MARTIN GONZALEZ.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MARTIN GONZALEZ.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF MARTIN GONZALEZ AS TO MARTIN GONZALEZ ADDING ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF BRADLEY S WALLACE, PC FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF MARTIN GONZALEZ AS TO MARTIN GONZALEZ ADDING ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF BRADLEY S WALLACE, PC FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE.

ANSWER FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MARTIN GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MARTIN GONZALEZ.; Minutes; Receipt: 180411-0527 $150.00; 180411-0527-CK Reference Number CK#5008918

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.; Minutes; Receipt: 180410-0616 $150.00; 180410-0616-CK Reference Number 11408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: PATRICIA VEGA; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY AMANDA FIGUEROA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARTIN GONZALEZ.; ATTORNEY ROBERT J OCONNER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT SETS TRIAL DATES AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 11/08/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 7 DAYS.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 7 DAYS; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH SIDES.; JURY FEES ARE TO BE POSTED WITHIN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO POST JURY FEES WILL BE DEEMED A; WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0714 $6.50; 171116-0714-CK Reference Number 448312

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY MICHAEL COLLETTI, STEPHANIE COLLETTI

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARTIN GONZALEZ FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARTIN GONZALEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARTIN GONZALEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S22

    Read MoreRead Less