This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 11:14:20 (UTC).

GOMEZ -V- THE HERT CORP.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2016 GOMEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE HERT CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5471

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE LUIS GOMEZ

Defendant

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHIMMEL & PARKS

15303 Ventura Blvd, Suite 650

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorney

NIXON PEABODY LLP

300 S Grand Av 41St Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SET FOR HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL ON 4/26/17 AT; 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT S32 LOCATED AT 247 W. THIRD STREET SAN BERNARDINO, CA 92415

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY THE HERTZ CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 2:16-CV-8025.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY THE HERTZ CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 2:16-CV-8025.

ANSWER FILED BY THE HERTZ CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY NIXON PEABODY LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY THE HERTZ CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY NIXON PEABODY LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE HERTZ CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE HERTZ CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/28/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; MICHAEL KIM APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSE LUIS GOMEZ.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT CONFIRMS WITH COUNSEL THAT THERE IS A JURY TRIAL SET IN THE FEDERAL COURT.; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: CASE REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT AND JURY TRIAL SET.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • FILE ROUTED TO S32 FOR 4/26 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATIONS STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: HIGHER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SET FOR HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL ON 4/26/17 AT; 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT S32 LOCATED AT 247 W. THIRD STREET SAN BERNARDINO, CA 92415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY THE HERTZ CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 2:16-CV-8025.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE HERTZ CORPORATION FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161024-0898 $435.00; 161024-0898-CK Reference Number 81398

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2016
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0057150263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • PLAINTIFF JOSE LUIS GOMEZ FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE LUIS GOMEZ FOR FAX/COPY/EP; Minutes; Receipt: 160921-0686 $39.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE LUIS GOMEZ FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160921-0664 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less