This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2019 at 20:48:30 (UTC).

GOMEZ -V- SCHMIDT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 GOMEZ filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SCHMIDT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2273

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REGULO GOMEZ

FABIANA GOMEZ

Defendant

ROBERTO A. SCHMIDT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE P HOBSON JR

961 W Holt Bl

Ontario, CA 91762-3600

 

Court Documents

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 04/06/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT REGULO GOMEZ, FABIANA GOMEZ HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ROBERTO A. SCHMIDT:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $77,425.50 INTEREST $58,068.73 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $135,524.23; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

ORIGINAL CASE W/JUDGMENT (SCVSS140320) (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE W/JUDGMENT (SCVSS140320) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; WRIT, ABSTRACT, MEMO OF COSTS, CK #12305 FOR $50.00 ARE RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS:; 1) THE ABSTRACT SUBMITTED IS CORRECT AND COULD HAVE BEEN ISSUED PROVIDED THE CHECK WAS FOR; $25.00; 2) THERE A FEW PROBLEMS WITH THE WRIT RELATED TO THE AMOUNTS REFLECTED ON LINES 11; THRU 18. ONCE A JUDGMENT IS RENEWED THE TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT ON LINE 11 IS THE NEW TOTAL; JUDGMENT AMOUNT AND THE INTEREST REFLECTED ON LINE 16 IS ONLY FOR INTEREST ACCRUED AFTER THE; JUDGMENT HAS BEEN RENEWED; 3) IF YOU HAVE POST-JUDGMENT COSTS THEY MUST BE REQUESTED USING; THE MC-012 FORM (PROVIDED); 4) LINES 19A & 19B MUST BE COMPLETED ON YOUR WRIT (19A IS THE DAILY; INTEREST AMOUNT YOU WANT THE SHERIFF TO ADD WHEN ATTEMPTING TO COLLECT AND LINE 19B IS USUALLY "0.; 0").

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/08/17.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/08/17.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( IN THE AMOUNT OF 135549.23 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0218 $25.00; 170526-0218-CK Reference Number 12305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 170526-0211 $25.00; 170526-0211-CK Reference Number 12305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 03/08/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROOF OF RENEWAL/WRIT/ABSTRACT/CK #12305 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE ORIGINAL SEALED NOTICE AND A COPY OF THE APPLICATION MU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; WRIT, ABSTRACT, MEMO OF COSTS, CK #12305 FOR $50.00 ARE RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS:; 1) THE ABSTRACT SUBMITTED IS CORRECT AND COULD HAVE BEEN ISSUED PROVIDED THE CHECK WAS FOR; $25.00; 2) THERE A FEW PROBLEMS WITH THE WRIT RELATED TO THE AMOUNTS REFLECTED ON LINES 11; THRU 18. ONCE A JUDGMENT IS RENEWED THE TOTAL JUDGMENT AMOUNT ON LINE 11 IS THE NEW TOTAL; JUDGMENT AMOUNT AND THE INTEREST REFLECTED ON LINE 16 IS ONLY FOR INTEREST ACCRUED AFTER THE; JUDGMENT HAS BEEN RENEWED; 3) IF YOU HAVE POST-JUDGMENT COSTS THEY MUST BE REQUESTED USING; THE MC-012 FORM (PROVIDED); 4) LINES 19A & 19B MUST BE COMPLETED ON YOUR WRIT (19A IS THE DAILY; INTEREST AMOUNT YOU WANT THE SHERIFF TO ADD WHEN ATTEMPTING TO COLLECT AND LINE 19B IS USUALLY "0.; 0").

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL CASE W/JUDGMENT (SCVSS140320) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY REGULO GOMEZ, FABIANA GOMEZ FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0499 $30.00; 170208-0499-CK Reference Number CK 12247

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 04/06/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT REGULO GOMEZ, FABIANA GOMEZ HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ROBERTO A. SCHMIDT:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $77,425.50 INTEREST $58,068.73 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $135,524.23; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.