This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 08:59:31 (UTC).

GOLIYAN -V- MYERS

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 GOLIYAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MYERS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0013

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERTSEL GOLIYAN

Defendant

ASHLEY MYERS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER)

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/17/2017 OF HERTSEL GOLIYAN ORDERED ENTERED 02/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HERTSEL GOLIYAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ASHLEY MYERS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ASHLEY MYERS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASHLEY MYERS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASHLEY MYERS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ASHLEY MYERS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ASHLEY MYERS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON HERTSEL GOLIYAN FOR WRIT FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/17/2017 OF HERTSEL GOLIYAN ORDERED ENTERED 02/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HERTSEL GOLIYAN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ASHLEY MYERS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ASHLEY MYERS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASHLEY MYERS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/17/2017 OF HERTSEL GOLIYAN AS TO ASHLEY MYERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ASHLEY MYERS; PARTY SERVED ON 01/17/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • 3/13/17 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY HERTSEL GOLIYAN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON HERTSEL GOLIYAN FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY HERTSEL GOLIYAN.

    Read MoreRead Less