This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/28/2018 at 19:04:38 (UTC).

GOLDEN STATE -V- MONTCLAIR

Case Summary

On 10/14/2010 GOLDEN STATE filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MONTCLAIR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3074

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC

Defendant

MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINLEY & STYSKAL

2600 Walnut Ave Suite E

Tustin, CA 92780

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2011
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: COM-POST Disp.; Minutes; RONALD J GILBERT, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; 09:17; MOTION; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY THE PLAINTIFF/COUNSEL; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION; Minutes; Receipt: 110322-0611 $40.00; 110322-0611-CK Reference Number 2316

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • DECL OF THOMAS G STYSKAL RE: APPL AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF THIRD PARTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 110222-3939 $25.00; 110222-3939-CK Reference Number 2290

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2011
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 10/14/2010 OF GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $27,962.57 INTEREST $173.33 ATTORNEY FEES $800.00 COSTS $597.75 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $29,533.65; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: CATHY KRUEGER; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC, MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN; COURT JUDGMENT PACKAGE RECVD 010611; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/18/11 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCRU.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: DANILO SANTIAGO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN; PROCEEDINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 01/07/11 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCRU; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • REQ TO SET FOR TRIAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER ATTY THOMAS STYSKAL,585 DECL FOR MONEY JUDGME NT WILL BE SUBMITTED INSTEAD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 10/14/2010 OF GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC AS TO MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MONTCLAIR VALLEY RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP IN SERVED ON 10/23/10 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT CCRU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 101015-0331 $355.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE FIRE PROTECTION INC is a litigant