This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 01/12/2019 at 02:36:00 (UTC).

GOETZ -V- DAUGHERTY

Case Summary

On 08/05/2013 GOETZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAUGHERTY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0227

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIKE GOETZ

ROSE GOETZ

Defendants

RACHEL DAUGHERTY

GREG DAUGHERTY

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS IS GRANTED. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS IS GRANTED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS FILED BY GREG DAUGHERTY. (IMAGED)

REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS FILED BY GREG DAUGHERTY. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY GREG DAUGHERTY IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): OTHER: DEFENDANT SHOULD APPEAR BY COURT CALL (IMAGED)

WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY GREG DAUGHERTY IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): OTHER: DEFENDANT SHOULD APPEAR BY COURT CALL (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 131108-0174 $20.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO GREG DAUGHERTY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/03/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $60.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO GREG DAUGHERTY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/03/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $60.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO RACHEL DAUGHERTY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/03/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $60.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO RACHEL DAUGHERTY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/03/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $60.00. (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 130805-2327 $50.00; 130805-2327-CK Reference Number 3848

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2014
  • RETURNED MAIL GIVEN TO JUGMENT CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: DEF REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS (ADRSS: ROSE G) RECEIVED BACK FROM POSTAL SERVICE--INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL FROM DEF FWD ON 12-31-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL FROM DEF FRWD ON 12-31-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS IS GRANTED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS RECEIVED BACK FROM RACHEL DAUGHERTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM MIKE GOETZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM GREG DAUGHERTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM ROSE GOETZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING, FILED BY GREG DAUGHERTY IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): OTHER: DEFENDANT SHOULD APPEAR BY COURT CALL (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 131108-0174 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO GREG DAUGHERTY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/03/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $60.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO RACHEL DAUGHERTY. PARTY SERVED ON 10/03/13. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $60.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; FRANK GAFKOWSKI, JUDGE; CLERK: ROSALIE MENDOZA; COURT REPORTER GARY RAGLE 9848; BAILIFF: J COX; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ROSE GOETZ PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MIKE GOETZ, ROSE GOETZ, GREG DAUGHERTY; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO SERVE ON DEFENDANT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/02/13 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 130805-2327 $50.00; 130805-2327-CK Reference Number 3848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO M4

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.