This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:19:18 (UTC).

GODINEZ-V-C&C AUTOMOTIVE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 GODINEZ-V-C C AUTOMOTIVE was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2090

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGER GODINEZ

Defendants

C&C AUTOMOTIVE INVESTMENT GROUP,

A TO Z INVESTMENTSGROUP

BASEMA AHMAD AL-BAGHDADI

MOHAMMED YOUSEF AL-BAGHDADI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER J. CUMMISKEY

5042 Wilshire Blvd. #39306

Los Angeles, CA 90036

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0594 $435.00; 170206-0594-CK Reference Number #4787

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: ALL DEFENDANTS FAILED TO APPEAR.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER CUMMISKEYS MOT ION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • MOTION RE: RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (6-4-18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGER GODINEZ; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER CUMMISKEY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROGER GODINEZ.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; ROGER GODINEZ'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL IS HEARD.; COURT FINDS:; ROGER GODINEZ'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED.; MOVANT TO PREPARE ORDER AND NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER CUMMISKEY RE: HRG DATE CHANGE ON MTN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ROGER GODINEZ FOR MOTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180604-0297 $90.00; 180604-0297-CK Reference Number 5297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • MOTION RE: RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 06/24/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROGER GODINEZ (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (FAILURE TO APPEAR); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; CHRISTOPHER CUMMISKEY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ROGER GODINEZ.; DEFENDANT BASEMA AHMAD AL-BAGHDADI, MOHAMMED YOUSEF AL-BAGHDADI PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT INQUIRES OF PLAINTIFF COUNSEL REGARDING THE FAILURE TO APPEAR. OSC RE: DISMISSAL IS TAKEN; OFF CALENDAR.; COURT SETS MATTER FOR TRIAL.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES HAVE NO OBJECTION TO MEDIATION.; MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED BY 10/01/18.; JOINT TRIAL DOCUMENTS TO BE FILED AND SERVED AT TRIAL READINESS.; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 08/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 11/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/05/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S33 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 0 DAYS.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BASEMA AHMAD AL-BAGHDADI SERVED ON 03/07/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO A TO Z INVESTMENTSGROUP SERVED ON 03/07/17 WITH FEES OF $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO C&C AUTOMOTIVE INVESTMENT GROUP, SERVED ON 03/07/17 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0594 $435.00; 170206-0594-CK Reference Number #4787

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.