This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:28:28 (UTC).

GLORIA YVONNE ELLIOTT

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 GLORIA YVONNE ELLIOTT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0938

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LISA HOEFGEN

JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER

Decedent

GLORIA YVONNE ELLIOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ROBERT J SPITZ

204 North San Antonio Avenue

Ontario, CA 91762

SENA, DAVID M

226 W Foothill Blvd Ste A

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/17, FILED BY PETITIONER JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/17, FILED BY PETITIONER JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/17, FILED BY PETITIONER JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/17, FILED BY PETITIONER JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER (IMAGED)

EX PARTE APPL FOR APPRVL OF PROPOSED ACTION REGARDING FILED.

EX PARTE APPL FOR APPRVL OF PROPOSED ACTION REGARDING FILED.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED

NOTICE OF RULING ON LISA HOEFGENS DEMURRER TO JONOVA KNICKERBOCKERS P.C.850 COMPLAINT FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON LISA HOEFGENS DEMURRER TO JONOVA KNICKERBOCKERS P.C.850 COMPLAINT FILED.

MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/17, FILED BY PETITIONER JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 11/28/17, FILED BY PETITIONER JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171128-0735 $90.00; 171128-0735-CK Reference Number 1527

HRG OF 10/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED CORRECTED INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED.

AMENDED CORRECTED INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FILED.

PETITION FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER(PROBATE).

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ACTIONS FILED BY JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER

OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ACTIONS FILED BY JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER

HRG OF 08/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/21/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS FILED.

HRG OF 03/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL FIRST DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. SPITZ IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL FIRST DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. SPITZ IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/12/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/12/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LISA HOEFGEN

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LISA HOEFGEN

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • PETITION FOR RETURN OF REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT SPITZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PREVIOUSLY RULED UPON; HEARINGS:; VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 12/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 07/13/18 ====

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ACTION RE CAL REAL PROP; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROBERT SPTIZ PRESENT FOR LISA HOEFGEN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PREVIOUSLY RULED UPON; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/29/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/29/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION FOR JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER; DAVID M SENA DAVID M SENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ACTIONS RE CA REAL PROPERTY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED ACTION ETC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ADAM JEFFREY PRESENT FOR LISA HOEFGEN.; ATTORNEY DAVID SENA (LIMITED SCOPE) PRESENT FOR JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER.; JONOVA KNICKERBOCKER PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED; EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LISA HOEFGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LISA HOEFGEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160920-0726 $465.00; 160920-0726-CK Reference Number 112529/112533

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.