This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 14:58:55 (UTC).

GIOVE-V-LIMERICKS TAVERN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 GIOVE-V-LIMERICKS TAVERN, was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Robinson, Jay H and Apaloo, Khymberli S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0673

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Robinson, Jay H

Apaloo, Khymberli S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIOVE, MICHAEL

Defendants

UPLAND MOUNTAIN LLC

F&S INC

MAC TOWING AND RECOVERY SERVICES INC. AKA MTR SERVICES INC

TSAI, YICHUN

LIMERICKS TAVERN INC

DOERKEN PROPERTIES INC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Diederich & Associates

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling Filed

03/22/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

03/18/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

03/18/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

03/18/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

Further Trial Setting Conference

03/18/2021: Further Trial Setting Conference

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/18/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Trial Setting Conference

12/16/2020: Trial Setting Conference

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/16/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON DOERKE

09/11/2020: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON DOERKE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

09/04/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

WITNESS PROOF OF SERVICE DECLARATION - LA TOSHA PA

09/04/2020: WITNESS PROOF OF SERVICE DECLARATION - LA TOSHA PA

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MAC TOWING AND RE

09/04/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MAC TOWING AND RE

WITNESS PROOF OF SERVICE DECLARATION- LA TOSHA PAY

09/04/2020: WITNESS PROOF OF SERVICE DECLARATION- LA TOSHA PAY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LIMERICKS TAVERN

09/04/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LIMERICKS TAVERN

WITNESS PROOF OF SERVICE DECLARATION - LA TOSHA PA

09/04/2020: WITNESS PROOF OF SERVICE DECLARATION - LA TOSHA PA

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST YICHUN TSAI FILED

09/04/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST YICHUN TSAI FILED

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

08/26/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PNS STORES INC., BIG LOTS, W

08/19/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PNS STORES INC., BIG LOTS, W

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/27/2021

DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: post mediation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2021

DocketVoluntary Civil Mediation Session; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Ruling Filed; Comment: After Further Trial Setting Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2021

DocketCase referred to Court-sponsored Mediation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: mediation request form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2021

DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2021
View Court Documents

DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Robinson, Jay H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketTrial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Apaloo, Khymberli S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2020

DocketPersonal Service; Anticipated Server; Anticipated Method; Served: 09/11/2020; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DOERKEN PROPERTIESINC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 07/06/20 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
06/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: WITNESS AFFIDAVIT: RICHARD PREUSS FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Initiated and Party Information Entered; Comment: CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020

DocketFiling Fee Waived for; Comment: FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL GIOVE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $380.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020

DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL GIOVE IS GRA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed; Comment: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2020

DocketRequest for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL GIOVE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less