This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/31/2019 at 04:38:26 (UTC).

GINNY LUDWIKOWSKI -V- ROBERT RICHARD ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/11/2010 GINNY LUDWIKOWSKI filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROBERT RICHARD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0017

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GINNY LUDWIKOWSKI

Defendants

RUBY RICHARD

ROBERT RICHARD

Assignee

HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

TAPPAN ZEE, ESQ

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,101.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $53,238.08)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,101.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $53,238.08)

MOTION RE: APP FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SET FOR HEARING ON 07/18/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: APP FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SET FOR HEARING ON 07/18/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: APP FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SET FOR HEARING ON 07/18/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: APP FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SET FOR HEARING ON 07/18/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OOSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OOSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $9,101.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $9,101.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SHERIFFS SALE OF REAL PROPERTY BY PUBLICATION ON 01/02/19 AS TO GOVERNMENT PUBLIC NOTICE, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SHERIFFS SALE OF REAL PROPERTY BY PUBLICATION ON 01/02/19 AS TO GOVERNMENT PUBLIC NOTICE, FILED.

 

Docket Entries

07/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SHERIFFS SALE OF REAL PROPERTY BY PUBLICATION ON 01/02/19 AS TO GOVERNMENT PUBLIC NOTICE, FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2019
View Court Documents

DocketLEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $9,101.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OOSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF OSC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 08/25/18 AS TO THERESA D WILEY, FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2018

DocketMOTION RE: APP FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING (06.07.18) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2018

DocketVACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018

DocketFILING FEE PAID BY HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE FOR MOTION; ; Minutes; Receipt: 180608-0377 $90.00 ; 180608-0377-EZ Reference Number 4273E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION RE: APP FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SET FOR HEARING ON 07/18/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HIGH DESERT CREDITORS SERVICE (IMAGED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2018

DocketUPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
04/11/2012

DocketON RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED 03/11/2010 OF GINNY LUDWIKOWSKI FOR ROBERT RICHARD, ADD ROBERT L RICHARD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2012

DocketAFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY AND ORDER FILED.; ; Minutes; ; IT IS ORDERED THAT THE TERM JUDGMENT DEBTOR INCLUDE THE NAME OF ROBERT L RICHARD AND MAY BE; ; ; ADDED TO WRIT OF EXECUTION OR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT.;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2012

DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,526.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,140.78)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2012

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2010

DocketNOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2010

DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; ; Minutes; Receipt: 100405-4128 $25.00 ;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): INCORRECT AMOUNT AS OF RENEWAL & ALSO MISSING RENEWAL DATE..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

DocketRENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; ; Minutes; ; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 07/31/03 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; ; ; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT GINNY LUDWIKOWSKI HAVE &; ; ; RECOVER FROM ROBERT RICHARD, RUBY RICHARD:; ; ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $33,619.25 INTEREST $23,895.58 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $2,858.25 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; ; ; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $60,373.08; ; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ; ; DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ; ; CASE COMPLETE;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2010

DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; ; Minutes; Receipt: 100311-1214 $30.00 ;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less