This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:43:51 (UTC).

GILL -V- JPMCC

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 GILL filed an Other lawsuit against JPMCC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9489

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GURSHARN K. GILL

Defendant

JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CRAFTS LAW FIRM, PC

600 W Santa Ana Bl Ste 925

Santa Ana, CA 92701

WOLF, RIFKIN, SHAPIRO, SCHULMAN & RABKIN

11400 W. Olympic Blvd. Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1582

Defendant Attorney

THE RYAN FIRM

30 Corporate Park Suite 310

Irvine, CA 92606

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT.

NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC.

OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF GUNSHARN GILL FILED BY DEFT TRINITY PLACE

OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF GUNSHARN GILL FILED BY DEFT TRINITY PLACE

OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M LEVINE FILED BY TRINITY PLACE

OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M LEVINE FILED BY TRINITY PLACE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/05/18 FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/05/18 FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF GURSHARN K GILL FILED

DECLARATION OF GURSHARN K GILL FILED

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M LEVINE FILED

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN M LEVINE FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 03/05/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GURSHARN K. GILL (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 03/05/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GURSHARN K. GILL (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF ADRI DAVIS RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF ADRI DAVIS RE NOTICE OF EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF SARAH BORGHESE FILED

DECLARATION OF SARAH BORGHESE FILED

EX PARTE TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION FILED.

EX PARTE TO SPECIALLY SET MOTION FILED.

DECLARATION OF JOHNY YEE FILED

DECLARATION OF JOHNY YEE FILED

DECLARATION OF GEORGE D STRAGGAS FILED

DECLARATION OF GEORGE D STRAGGAS FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY GURSHARN K. GILL.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY GURSHARN K. GILL.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY GURSHARN K. GILL

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY GURSHARN K. GILL

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF RECORDS BY ORANGE COUNTY DATED 05/10/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • TRANSFERRED TO THE ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT - COUNTY OF ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION AND REQUEST FOR RECEIPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC FOR TRANSFER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180507-0130 $50.00; 180507-0130-CK Reference Number 7684

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF ORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: CHANGE OF VENUE BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: CHANGE OF VENUE BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE COMPLAINT - FILED BY DEFENDANT JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE RYAN FIRM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JPMCC 2006-LDP7 TRINITY PLACE,LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171113-0075 $435.00; 171113-0075-CK Reference Number 3577958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF GURSHARN GILL - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GURSHARN K. GILL FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0746 $435.00; 171004-0746-CK Reference Number CK 120408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF GURSHARN K. GILL FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less