Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 11:08:17 (UTC).

GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ ESQ. -V- NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 GILBERT M GUTIERREZ ESQ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3595

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL

Defendants

FORTRESS INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED

QUALITY LOANS SERVICE CORPORATION

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE HOLDINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF GILBERT M GUTIERREZ

4110 Brockton Avenue

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL.

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED

DECLARATION OF GILBERT GUTIERREZ IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE TRO FILED

DECLARATION OF GILBERT GUTIERREZ IN SUPPORT OF EXPARTE TRO FILED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TRO RE TRUSTEE SALE TO BE HEARD ON 07/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TRO RE TRUSTEE SALE TO BE HEARD ON 07/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26X.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CK 3620020823 SENT TO G.GUTIERREZ FOR $75000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL FOR FAX/COPY/POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170912-0479 $5.21; 170912-0479-VS Reference Number 033-0033154569

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • ORDER FOR RELEASE OF BOND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL FOR FAX/COPIES/POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 170822-0568 $5.71; 170822-0568-VS Reference Number 033-0030554689

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT R MITTAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ERIK JAMES HAMMETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ELENA LEONARD SPECIALLY APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATIONSTAR MORTGAGEHOLDINGS, INC., FORTRESS INVESTMENTGROUP, LLC,A LIMITED, QUALITY LOANS SERVICE CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INDICATES BOND WAS POSTED ON 07/19/17 AND ALL PARTIES WERE SERVED WITH THE; TEMPORARY RESTAINING ORDER ON THE SAME DAY.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL FURTHER INDICATES THERE IS NO NEED FOR THE COURT TO ISSUE A PRELIMINARY; INJUCTION BECAUSE THIS MATTER HAS SETTLED IN DUE COURSE. COUNSEL STATES FINAL DETAILS ON; SETTLEMENT NEED TO BE RESOLVED HOWEVER CASE HAS SETTLED.; THE COURT VACATES THE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND EXONERATES THE BOND. AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; REGARDING DISMISSAL IS SET AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL SET FOR 10/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL FOR FAX FILING, COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170817-0912 $4.71

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TRO RE TRUSTEE SALE TO BE HEARD ON 07/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL FOR EX-PARTE HEARING FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0363 $90.00; 170718-0363-CK Reference Number 6153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • PLAINTIFF GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GILBERT M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., ANINDIVIDUAL FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0611 $435.00; 170717-0611-CK Reference Number #6152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fortress Investment Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant