This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 19:04:11 (UTC).

G&F VS SOLIS

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 G F filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOLIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7666

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G&F FINANCIAL INC

Defendant

SAMUEL SOLIS

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0760 $100.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO SAMUEL SOLIS. PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO SAMUEL SOLIS. PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180424-0652 $25.00; 180424-0652-CK Reference Number 3215

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $190.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • WRIT RETURNED -- ( UNSATISFIED) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180202-0651 $25.00; 180202-0651-CK Reference Number 2775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( OVER THE COUNTER ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF G&F FINANCIAL INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: M PLESCIA; APPEARANCES:; G&F FINANCIAL INC REPRESENTED BY ANGEL GODINEZ.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:31; SAMUEL SOLIS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ANGEL GODINEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SAMUEL SOLIS.; JUDGMENT FOR: G&F FINANCIAL INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SAMUEL SOLIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $115.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,115.00; 10:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO SAMUEL SOLIS. PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS); Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0760 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less