This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/10/2018 at 07:16:20 (UTC).

GEC ELECTRIC -V- CALIFORNIA FINE WINE

Case Summary

On 07/06/2012 GEC ELECTRIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALIFORNIA FINE WINE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1490

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEC ELECTRIC, INC.

Defendant

CALIFORNIA FINE WINE & SPIRITS, LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2012
  • EXHIBITS UNCLAIMED BY DEFT DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; DOUGLAS M ELWELL, JUDGE; CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; CALIFORNIA FINE WINE & SPIRITS,LLC REPRESENTED BY EILEEN SIMONE (VIA TELECOM).; CALIFORNIA FINE WINE & SPIRITS,LLC REPRESENTED BY C. SCOTT LITTEN (VIA TELECOM).; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GEC ELECTRIC, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY MOVING PARTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DEFENDANTS REPRESENTATIVE-EILEEN M SIMONE-NOTIFIE D BY PHONE OF TIME AND PHONE # TO CALL FOR APPRNC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY- GRANTED BY JUDGE ELWELL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • LETTER RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE RECEIVED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFT FRWD TO J/A IN F2 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 120706-2966 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Fine Wine & Spirits, LLC is a litigant