This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 01:02:00 (UTC).

GE MONEY BANK -v- PADILLA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 GE MONEY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PADILLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6084

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GE MONEY BANK

Defendant

HAYDEE PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GE MONEY BANK FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 120508-2869 $3.00; 120508-2869-VS Reference Number 028-0042841082

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED ON 12/28/11 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF GE MONEY BANK AS TO HAYDEE PADILLA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST HAYDEE PADILLA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO HAYDEE PADILLA SERVED ON 05/31/11 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110517-0085 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less