This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/12/2018 at 01:14:06 (UTC).

GE MONEY BANK -v- ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 GE MONEY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ORTEGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6093

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GE MONEY BANK

Defendant

JOSE ORTEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLEIER & COX

16130 Ventura Blvd. Suite 620

Encino, CA 91436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2015
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 3206.20 ); Minutes; Receipt: 130103-1194 $25.00; 130103-1194-CK Reference Number 029323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $49.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $283.43)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 120224-0831 $25.00; 120224-0831-CK Reference Number 025134

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOSE ORTEGA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF GE MONEY BANK AS TO JOSE ORTEGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF GE MONEY BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033(B) FILED BY GE MONEY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: WAIVING ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY GE MONEY BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF GE MONEY BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF GE MONEY BANK ORDERED ENTERED 12/05/11; JUDGMENT FOR: GE MONEY BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE ORTEGA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,556.77 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $292.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,848.77; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSE ORTEGA SERVED ON 05/31/11 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110517-0294 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less