This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 03/24/2019 at 23:56:00 (UTC).

GAXIOLA -V- HERRERA (NON MASTER)

Case Summary

On 10/07/2015 GAXIOLA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERRERA NON MASTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1915

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL GAXIOLA

JUNEAUX GAXIOLA

Defendants

JOSE CAZARES HERRERA

HAYDEE CAZARES

 

Court Documents

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:15; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; BAILIFF: L. DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA, JUNEAUX GAXIOLA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO CONTINUE THIS MATTER UNTIL AFTER MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL SET FOR 05/12/16 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued

HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUNEAUX GAXIOLA; ATTORNEY STACEY DAVIS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:31; ATTORNEY DAVIS IS REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE DUE TO ANOTHER CASE HAVING BEEN FILED ON THE SAME ISSUES; IN THE SAN BERNARDINO COURT.; PLAINTIFF OBJECTS TO CONTINUANCE.; IN THE INTEREST OF JUDICIAL ECONOMY; COURT GRANTS CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/07/16 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/07/2015 OF MICHAEL GAXIOLA FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/07/2015 OF MICHAEL GAXIOLA FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:26; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; BAILIFF: D. GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA PRESENT; DEFENDANT JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; 13A*PDE.; WITNESS -- MICHAEL GAXIOLA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JOSE CAZARES HERRERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- HAYDEE CAZARES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO THE PARTIES.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; SUBSEQUENTLY:; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; COURT FINDS JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/07/2015 OF MICHAEL GAXIOLA ORDERED ENTERED 11/23/15; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL GAXIOLA, JUNEAUX GAXIOLA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $275.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,275.00; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 11/23/15 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CARA HUSTON; BAILIFF: D GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA, JUNEAUX GAXIOLA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:56; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/23/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE OF 11/23/15 HEARING MAY BE SENT 1ST CLASS MAIL.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM/ORDER FILED AS TO JOSE CAZARES HERRERA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/07/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM/ORDER FILED AS TO JOSE CAZARES HERRERA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/07/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM/ORDER FILED AS TO HAYDEE CAZARES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/07/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM/ORDER FILED AS TO HAYDEE CAZARES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/07/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 151007-1502 $75.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2016
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • VACATE HSCA HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/12/16 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIV DS 1600157 MASTER FILE CIV DS 1066157; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:15; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; BAILIFF: L. DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA, JUNEAUX GAXIOLA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS GOOD CAUSE TO CONTINUE THIS MATTER UNTIL AFTER MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL SET FOR 05/12/16 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING RE SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CHARLES J UMEDA, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: L DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JUNEAUX GAXIOLA; ATTORNEY STACEY DAVIS PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; DEFENDANT JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 02:31; ATTORNEY DAVIS IS REQUESTING A CONTINUANCE DUE TO ANOTHER CASE HAVING BEEN FILED ON THE SAME ISSUES; IN THE SAN BERNARDINO COURT.; PLAINTIFF OBJECTS TO CONTINUANCE.; IN THE INTEREST OF JUDICIAL ECONOMY; COURT GRANTS CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/07/16 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4.; NOTICE WAIVED.; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 151210-0485 $75.00; 151210-0485-CK Reference Number 1616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/07/2015 OF MICHAEL GAXIOLA FILED BY JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES.(SMALL CLAIMS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:26; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA O'BRIEN; BAILIFF: D. GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA PRESENT; DEFENDANT JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; 13A*PDE.; WITNESS -- MICHAEL GAXIOLA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- JOSE CAZARES HERRERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- HAYDEE CAZARES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; DOCUMENTS RETURNED TO THE PARTIES.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION; SUBSEQUENTLY:; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; COURT FINDS JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/07/2015 OF MICHAEL GAXIOLA ORDERED ENTERED 11/23/15; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL GAXIOLA, JUNEAUX GAXIOLA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $275.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,275.00; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 11/23/15 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; ROBERT G FOWLER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CARA HUSTON; BAILIFF: D GAULT; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL GAXIOLA, JUNEAUX GAXIOLA PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE CAZARES HERRERA, HAYDEE CAZARES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:56; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/23/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1.; NOTICE OF 11/23/15 HEARING MAY BE SENT 1ST CLASS MAIL.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • UPDATE JURISDICTION TO BS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM/ORDER FILED AS TO JOSE CAZARES HERRERA. PARTY SERVED ON 10/07/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM/ORDER FILED AS TO HAYDEE CAZARES. PARTY SERVED ON 10/07/15. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000; Minutes; Receipt: 151007-1502 $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.