Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 22:50:27 (UTC).

GARY TOLE N ANN GRENNAN-TOLE

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 GARY TOLE N ANN GRENNAN-TOLE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2615

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARY TOLE

Respondent

ANN GRENNAN-TOLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180404-0181 $17.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANN GRENNAN-TOLE FOR 1 CERT JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180201-0332 $17.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • COPIES MAILED IN SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 10/22/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/29/2017 OF GARY TOLE FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/29/2017 OF GARY TOLE ORDERED ENTERED 09/19/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 03/29/2017 OF GARY TOLE AS TO ANN GRENNAN-TOLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANN GRENNAN-TOLE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ANN GRENNAN-TOLE FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GARY TOLE FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/PETITION FILED AS TO ANN GRENNAN-TOLE. PARTY SERVED ON 04/21/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/NOTICE ACKDGE SENT.; Minutes; YOUR FORMS ARE BEING RETURNED TO YOU BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): YOUR FORMS ARE; INCOMPLETE. PLEASE SEE RED MARKS FOR COMPLETION. MAKE CORRECTIONS TO ORIGINAL AND COPIES. PLEASE; REVISE AND RESUBMIT. THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GARY TOLE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY GARY TOLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GARY TOLE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less