This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:35:58 (UTC).

GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS -V- CHEEMA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CHEEMA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7410

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.

Defendant

CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS JENSEN & SWAN LLP

3233 Arlington Avenue Suite 203

Riverside, CA 92506

Defendant Attorney

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

100 Corson Street Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161228-0162 $3.00; 161228-0162-MC Reference Number 026-0002315666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND TRIAL FILED BY GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER JENSEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC..; ATTORNEY SARAH SPINUZZI PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY FOR TRIAL.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 03/16/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23; COURT TRIAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF GARDNER GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC. IS SET FOR 03/20/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S23; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • ANSWER FILED BY CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMEMDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC; Disposition: Overruled; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER JENSEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY SARAH SPINUZZI PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC'S MOTION DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; THE COURT INFORMS COUNSEL OF THE TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; DEMURRER IS OVERRULED; HEARINGS:; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/19/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/30/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S23; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER JENSEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY SARAH SPINUZZI PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEARD.; THE COURT INFORMS COUNSEL OF THE TENTATIVE RULING.; ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED.; COURT FINDS:; CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2016
  • DEFENDANT CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160105-1375 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • DEMURRER FILED BY CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC; REPRESENTED BY WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 02/02/16, FILED BY DEFENDANT CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHEEMA FREIGHTLINES, LLC SERVED ON 12/07/15 WITH FEES OF $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 151125-1383 $435.00; 151125-1383-CK Reference Number 14172

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cheema Freightlines, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant