This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 23:22:54 (UTC).

GARCIA VS PERALTA

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 GARCIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PERALTA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3043

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS M GARCIA

Defendants

EDGAR PERALTA

KARINA A URUELA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN FILE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN FILE); Minutes; Receipt: 170606-0008 $25.00; 170606-0008-CK Reference Number 1065

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/05/2017 OF LUIS GARCIA ORDERED ENTERED 06/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LUIS M GARCIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KARINA A URUELA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/12/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KARINA A URUELA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/12/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON EDGAR PERALTA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/12/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON EDGAR PERALTA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 05/12/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170505-0723 $255.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LUIS M GARCIA FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170606-0933 $4.71; 170606-0933-CS Reference Number CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN FILE); Minutes; Receipt: 170606-0008 $25.00; 170606-0008-CK Reference Number 1065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/05/2017 OF LUIS GARCIA AS TO EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/05/2017 OF LUIS GARCIA ORDERED ENTERED 06/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: LUIS M GARCIA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: EDGAR PERALTA, KARINA A URUELA. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LUIS M GARCIA FOR DEFAULT PKT; Minutes; Receipt: 170531-0850 $4.21

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DUPLICATE POS FOR EDGAR PERALTA PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON EDGAR PERALTA; PARTY SERVED ON 05/12/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDGAR PERALTA FOR ANSWER; Minutes; Receipt: 170510-0608 $0.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $22.50.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170505-0723 $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.