This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 21:01:38 (UTC).

GARCIA -V- VALENZUELA

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 GARCIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VALENZUELA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2423

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAEL A GARCIA

ANGELICA M GARCIA

Defendants

GUILLERMO VALENZUELA

LETICIA VALENZUELA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELAINE S. ASHTON

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant Attorney

BEAUDRY, STEPHANIE

301 W Mission Blvd. Ste 303

Pomona, CA 91766

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON LETICIA VALENZUELA; POSTED ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON LETICIA VALENZUELA; POSTED ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON GUILLERMO VALENZUELA; POSTED ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON GUILLERMO VALENZUELA; POSTED ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY GUILLERMO VALENZUELA, LETICIA VALENZUELA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY STEPHANIE BEAUDRY.

ANSWER FILED BY GUILLERMO VALENZUELA, LETICIA VALENZUELA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY STEPHANIE BEAUDRY.; Minutes; Receipt: 170420-0590 $480.00; 170420-0590-VS Reference Number 031-0012856701

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170413-0737 $255.00; 170413-0737-CK Reference Number 532408

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): A DISMISSAL WAS SUBMITTED BEFORE CASE SET FOR TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • RTS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PROOFS/RTS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • REQUEST TO SET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NAME/ADDRESS ON POS TO WHOM RTS WAS MAILED DOES NOT MATCH COURT RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON LETICIA VALENZUELA; POSTED ON 04/20/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY GUILLERMO VALENZUELA, LETICIA VALENZUELA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY STEPHANIE BEAUDRY.; Minutes; Receipt: 170420-0590 $480.00; 170420-0590-VS Reference Number 031-0012856701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • ANSWER/VERIFICATION/POS BY FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170417-0574 $20.00; 170417-0574-CK Reference Number 532585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $60.00.--BEGINNING ON 04/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170413-0737 $255.00; 170413-0737-CK Reference Number 532408

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.