This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 15:27:48 (UTC).

GARCIA-V-MENTOR

Case Summary

On 02/23/2018 GARCIA-V-MENTOR was filed as a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvarez, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4411

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Alvarez, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIEL ARTEAGA GARCIA

GARCIA, DANIEL ARTEAGA

Defendants

CHANTELL SMITH

COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES,

MENTOR MANAGEMENT,INC.

HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC.

CHANTAL SMITH

MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC

SMITH, CHANTAL

NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC

Not Yet Classified

SMITH, CHANTELL

MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. DBA THE MENTOR

COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES

THE MENTOR NETWORK

CALIFORNIA MENTOR

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SIRKIN LAW GROUP

20750 Ventura Blvd., #201

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Skapik Law Group

Attorney at Skapik Law Group

Defendant Attorney

DELFINO MADDEN O'MALLEY COYLE & KOEWLER LLP

Attorney at DELFINO MADDEN O'MALLEY COYLE & KOEWLER LLP

500 Capitol Mall Suite 1550

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE-TO COMPEL COLE'S FURTH

09/02/2020: REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE-TO COMPEL COLE'S FURTH

REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE-TO COMPEL FURTHER RSPNS

08/28/2020: REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION RE-TO COMPEL FURTHER RSPNS

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY HORRIGAN COLE ENTERP

06/05/2020: POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY HORRIGAN COLE ENTERP

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES-

11/15/2019: STIPULATION AND ORDER RE- TO EXTEND THE DEADLINES-

RULING ON DEFENDANT'S 5 DISCOVERY MOTIONS (IMAGED)

10/09/2019: RULING ON DEFENDANT'S 5 DISCOVERY MOTIONS (IMAGED)

OBJECTION TO COMPEL FUR RESPS TO REQ FOR PROD OF D

08/15/2019: OBJECTION TO COMPEL FUR RESPS TO REQ FOR PROD OF D

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPP OF MTN TO CMPL FURTHER

07/17/2019: SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPP OF MTN TO CMPL FURTHER

MOTION RE- COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO FORM INTERROGS S

07/16/2019: MOTION RE- COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO FORM INTERROGS S

SEPARATE STMT OF DISPUTED DISCOVERY ISO MOT TO COM

07/16/2019: SEPARATE STMT OF DISPUTED DISCOVERY ISO MOT TO COM

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL BRIE

07/11/2019: OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE- TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL BRIE

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DANIEL ARTEA

06/14/2019: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DANIEL ARTEA

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE HORRIGA

05/28/2019: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE HORRIGA

DECLARATION RE- EMILEE LANDON FILED BY DANIEL ARTE

04/17/2019: DECLARATION RE- EMILEE LANDON FILED BY DANIEL ARTE

DECLARATION RE- AMBER M CASANTA FILED BY DANIEL AR

04/17/2019: DECLARATION RE- AMBER M CASANTA FILED BY DANIEL AR

DECLARATION OF PAUL BARRON ISO MSJ FILED

01/28/2019: DECLARATION OF PAUL BARRON ISO MSJ FILED

INDEX TO EVIDENCE ISO MSJ FILED.

01/28/2019: INDEX TO EVIDENCE ISO MSJ FILED.

SEPARATE STATMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ISO

01/28/2019: SEPARATE STATMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ISO

ANSWER FILED BY HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC., C

03/28/2018: ANSWER FILED BY HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC., C

209 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal With Prejudice (Before Trial); Party; Names; GARCIA, DANIEL ARTEAGA; MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION; HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC.; SMITH, CHANTAL; NATIONAL MENTOR HOLDINGS, INC.; HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC.; CONV; MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. DBA THE MENTOR; COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES; COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES; SMITH, CHANTELL; THE MENTOR NETWORK; COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES; CALIFORNIA MENTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal as to Entire Action Filed; Comment: With prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: re: appeals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialMENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Mail Payment; Receipt # SC-2021-12904; Southern California Legal Support Services Inc.; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialMENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Transaction Assessment; $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order filed; Comment: vacate status conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $20.00 check paid on 03/12/2021 for Stip & Order Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceived an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date; Comment: Petition for writ of mandate and request for immediate stary are DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
425 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2018
  • FinancialMENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Total Financial Assessment: $20.00; Total Payments and Credits: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fees Posted; Comment: ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR DANIEL ARTEAGA GARCIA. 180223-0542-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 180223-0542-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 17404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY DANIEL ARTEAGA GARCIA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE 180223-0540-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 180223-0540-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 17404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketAttorney of Record Changed; Comment: SIRKIN LAW GROUP IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR DANIEL ARTEAGA GARCIA, AND SKAPIK LAW GROUP IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where National Mentor Holdings, Inc. doing business as The Mentor Network doing business as Florida Mentor is a litigant

Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where California Mentor is a litigant