This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:58:31 (UTC).

GARCIA, ET AL -V- A&G TRUCKING, LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against A G TRUCKING, LLC. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2074

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

MARIE DORADO

BOBBY VALENCIA JR.

SYLVIA GARCIA

RAYLENE VALENCIA

BOBBY VALENCIA

PAULA ESQUIVEL

BILLY DORADO

DARLENE PUENTE

ANDREA VALENCIA

Defendants

A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

BRAULIO MARTINEZ

B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA

BILLIE DORADO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

KIESEL LAW LLP

Defendant Attorney

POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE, LLP

22972 Mill Creek Drive

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE,LLP.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT(S) SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT(S) SENT.; Minutes; ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SECOND; AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS NOT BEEN FILED. .

ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; LEAVE OF COURT GRANTED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA FOR 30 DAYS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO BILLIE DORADO, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO BILLIE DORADO, WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA, BOBBY VALENCIA JR..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA, BOBBY VALENCIA JR..

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ.

ANSWER FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE,LLP.

DECLARATION OF ANDREA VALENCIA PURSUANT TO SECT. CODE 377.32 FILED

DECLARATION OF ANDREA VALENCIA PURSUANT TO SECT. CODE 377.32 FILED

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR MARIE DORADO IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS MICHAEL LOPEZ.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR MARIE DORADO IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS MICHAEL LOPEZ.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR BOBBY VALENCIA JR. IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS PAULA ESQUIVEL.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR BOBBY VALENCIA JR. IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS PAULA ESQUIVEL.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY A&G TRUCKING, LLC,A CALIFORNIALIMITED, B MARTINEZ TRUCKING, INC, A CALIFORNIA, BRAULIO MARTINEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY POLIQUIN & DEGRAVE,LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA, BILLY DORADO, DARLENE PUENTE IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFFS ON SECOND AMENDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENT(S) SENT.; Minutes; ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SECOND; AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS NOT BEEN FILED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; LEAVE OF COURT GRANTED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SYLVIA GARCIA FOR 30 DAYS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ASHLEY CONLOGUE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY GORMAN DEGRAVE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/17/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL NEED RESOLUTION OF MINORS LIENS; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA, BOBBY VALENCIA JR., ANDREA VALENCIA, BOBBY VALENCIA FOR STIP & ORDER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190531-0499 $20.00; 190531-0499-CK Reference Number CK #9421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM OF MINOR BOBBY VALENCIA JR. IS GRANTED. GUARDIAN AD LITEM IS PAULA ESQUIVEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/23/2018 OF SYLVIA GARCIA FOR SYLVIA GARCIA, ATTORNEY KIESEL LAW LLP ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • PLAINTIFF SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA, BOBBY VALENCIA JR. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SYLVIA GARCIA, MARIE DORADO, RAYLENE VALENCIA, BOBBY VALENCIA JR. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180823-0672 $435.00; 180823-0672-CK Reference Number CK 7137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.