This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 01:09:13 (UTC).

GALINA BUSHKOVA-N-ANDREY BUSHKOV

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 GALINA BUSHKOVA-N-ANDREY BUSHKOV was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8351

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALINA BUSHKOVA

Respondent

ANDREY BUSHKOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SINGER, MATTHEW J

444 N. Arrowhead Ave Ste 106

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT (9/27/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA RE: DIVISION OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY (062818)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA RE: DIVISION OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY (062818).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DECLARATION RE NOTICE AND SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDER FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • EX-PARTE RFO RE: OTHER: DIVISION OF COMMUNITY PROPERTY FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DEBORAH A DANIEL, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: NORMA MAGANA; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA GIULIANY 13842; BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER GALINA BUSHKOVA PRESENT; RESPONDENT ANDREY BUSHKOV PRESENT; MATTHEW J SINGER FOR ANDREY BUSHKOV NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; DECLARATION REGARDING EXPARTE NOTICE FILED.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; NO EMERGENCY - SET FOR HEARING ONLY; HEARINGS:; MATTER TO BE SET ON 07/23/18 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT S51.; PERSONAL SERVICE OF OSC DOCUMENTS EXECUTED ON THIS DATE IN OPEN COURT. PERSONAL SERVICE OF PARTY: ANDREY BUSHKOV. DATE: 06/28/18.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FILE REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GALINA BUSHKOVA FOR EXPARTE IN THE AMOUNT OF $180.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GALINA BUSHKOVA FOR COPIES IN THE AMOUNT OF $17.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT (9/27/17); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DEBORAH A DANIEL, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: MAYRA PANAMENO; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA GIULIANY 13842; BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER GALINA BUSHKOVA PRESENT; ATTORNEY MATTHEW SINGER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT ANDREY BUSHKOV PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S51.; REASON: THE PARTIES ARE WORKING TO SETTLE THE CASE; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON GALINA BUSHKOVA FOR 1ST FILING+RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • JBSIS STAT - SPOUSAL SUPPORT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY GALINA BUSHKOVA RE: (092717) SS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less