This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 08:53:32 (UTC).

GADJITEC CONSULTANT-V-AMBER ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 GADJITEC CONSULTANT-V-AMBER ANDERSON was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1928

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GADJITEC CONSULTANT GROUP LLC

Defendant

AMBER ANDERSON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRASNEY, ROBERT A

362 W 6Th St

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT; Disposition: DENIED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AMBER ANDERSON'S MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY WILLIAM GARRETT.; AMBER ANDERSON'S MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/08/2017 OF GADJITEC CONSULTANTGROUP LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/23/17; JUDGMENT FOR: GADJITEC CONSULTANTGROUP LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: AMBER ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: AMBER ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/09/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 08/09/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMBER ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMBER ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMBER ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/09/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMBER ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/09/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170808-0086 $255.00; 170808-0086-CK Reference Number 03548

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; AMBER ANDERSON'S MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT IS HEARD.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY WILLIAM GARRETT.; AMBER ANDERSON'S MOTION SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY AMBER ANDERSON IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON AMBER ANDERSON FOR FIRST APPARENCE FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY AMBER ANDERSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT TO BE HEARD ON 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMBER ANDERSON FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170919-1084 $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON AMBER ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/08/2017 OF GADJITEC CONSULTANTGROUP LLC AS TO AMBER ANDERSON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON AMBER ANDERSON; PARTY SERVED ON 08/09/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMBER ANDERSON FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170816-0902 $1.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,625.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170808-0086 $255.00; 170808-0086-CK Reference Number 03548

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.