Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 21:03:05 (UTC).

FUSARO V YOUNG

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 FUSARO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YOUNG. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1035

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL S FUSARO

Defendant

YOLANDA YOUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHTON, HELAINE S

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/11/2017 OF MICHAEL FUSARO GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL S FUSARO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YOLANDA YOUNG; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,475.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $510.00 AND DAMAGES $740.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,125.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

ORDER TO ACCEPT COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT FILED

ORDER TO ACCEPT COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT FILED

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170518-0171 $25.00; 170518-0171-CK Reference Number 533645

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON YOLANDA YOUNG.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON YOLANDA YOUNG.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/11/2017 OF MICHAEL FUSARO ORDERED ENTERED 05/17/17; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL S FUSARO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YOLANDA YOUNG; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: YOLANDA YOUNG. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

RENTAL AGREEMENT AND/OR LEASE PLACED IN FILE

RENTAL AGREEMENT AND/OR LEASE PLACED IN FILE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON YOLANDA YOUNG; PARTY SERVED ON 05/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON YOLANDA YOUNG; PARTY SERVED ON 05/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0734 $255.00; 170511-0734-CK Reference Number 533495

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2017
  • COPY OF JUDGMENT IN RAPID PICK UP BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/11/2017 OF MICHAEL FUSARO GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL S FUSARO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: YOLANDA YOUNG; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,475.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $510.00 AND DAMAGES $740.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,125.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO ACCEPT COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • 585 PACKET RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $510.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 06/06/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RENTAL AGREEMENT AND/OR LEASE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY YOLANDA YOUNG FOR FORMS; Minutes; Receipt: 170516-0694 $1.49; 170516-0694-DB Reference Number 026-0041418987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/11/2017 OF MICHAEL FUSARO FOR YOLANDA YOUNG, ADD YOLANDA M YOUNG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON YOLANDA YOUNG; PARTY SERVED ON 05/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170511-0734 $255.00; 170511-0734-CK Reference Number 533495

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 05/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S