This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:20:16 (UTC).

FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC -V- ORTEGA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORTEGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1588

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC

Defendants

ANTHONY N ORTEGA

MONIQUE A MARTINEZ

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180522-0493 $25.00; 180522-0493-CK Reference Number 33836

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $262.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $207.95), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $262.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $207.95), AND

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar

ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC REPRESENTED BY TINA ETOLL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:58; NO SERVICE.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180202-0192 $60.00; 180202-0192-CK Reference Number 33438

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC REPRESENTED BY TINA ETOLL - PROPERTY MANAGER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:36; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; TINA ETOLL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,829.57 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $363.95 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,193.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO MONIQUE A MARTINEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO MONIQUE A MARTINEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $59.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY N ORTEGA SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH FEES OF $79.50.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY N ORTEGA SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH FEES OF $79.50.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0321 $50.00; 170915-0321-EZ Reference Number 5EP17391LA977231

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180522-0493 $25.00; 180522-0493-CK Reference Number 33836

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $262.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $207.95), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MICHAEL A. CAMBER, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC REPRESENTED BY TINA ETOLL.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR.; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:58; NO SERVICE.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180202-0192 $60.00; 180202-0192-CK Reference Number 33438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC REPRESENTED BY TINA ETOLL - PROPERTY MANAGER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:36; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; TINA ETOLL IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANTHONY N ORTEGA, MONIQUE A MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,829.57 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $363.95 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,193.52; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF FUNDCOR GLOBAL LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171016-0399 $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO MONIQUE A MARTINEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 10/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $59.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY N ORTEGA SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH FEES OF $79.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0321 $50.00; 170915-0321-EZ Reference Number 5EP17391LA977231

    Read MoreRead Less