This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:18:39 (UTC).

FROME DEVELOPMENTS -V- RICE

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 FROME DEVELOPMENTS filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against RICE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2092

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FROME DEVELOPMENTSOMEGA LLC

Defendant

ROBERT RICE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2011
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: USE OF COPIES I LIEU OF ORIGINAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 <$25,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FROME DEVELOPMENTSOMEGA LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: FROME DEVELOPMENTSOMEGA LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT RICE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $700.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $465.00 AND DAMAGES $1,936.39.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,101.39; ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 - 10 ONLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ATTY BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 <$25,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FROME DEVELOPMENTSOMEGA LLC AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 <$25,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FROME DEVELOPMENTSOMEGA LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/13/11 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110512-3088 $20.00; 110512-3088-CK Reference Number 176261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $23.33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF >$10,000 <25,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4157 $255.00; 110504-4157-CK Reference Number 175741

    Read MoreRead Less