This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/04/2018 at 00:43:26 (UTC).

FRANKLIN-V-FRANKLIN

Case Summary

On 08/10/2012 FRANKLIN-V-FRANKLIN was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0452

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MAUREEN FRANKLIN

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD M GHAN

55198 Twentynine Palms Highway Suite 1

Yucca Valley, CA 92284

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KERENDIAN & ASSOCIATES

11755 Wilshire Blvd 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 120813-0443 $435.00; 120813-0443-CK Reference Number 3515

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 120813-0443 $435.00; 120813-0443-CK Reference Number 3515

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 120813-0443 $435.00; 120813-0443-CK Reference Number 3515

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY MAUREEN FRANKLIN.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY MAUREEN FRANKLIN.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED. (IMAGED)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37.; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/14 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S37.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 11/13/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/17/14 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S37 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ORDER RE PARTIES STIP AND PROPOSED ORDR FILED BY JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.

NOTICE OF ORDER RE PARTIES STIP AND PROPOSED ORDR FILED BY JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION OF TOM N TRAN RE: OSC RE PUBLICATION FILED

DECLARATION OF TOM N TRAN RE: OSC RE PUBLICATION FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN, CAUSE "ALL CAUSES ONLY" AS TO "ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN", WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN, CAUSE "ALL CAUSES ONLY" AS TO "ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN", WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DECLARATION OF RICHARD REGARDING OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

DECLARATION OF RICHARD REGARDING OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN SERVED ON 08/17/12 WITH FEES OF $70.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN SERVED ON 08/17/12 WITH FEES OF $70.00. (IMAGED)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2016
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA DEVORE 13842; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD M. GHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY EDRIN SHAMTOB APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPRESENT THAT MATTER HAS SETTLED AND REQUEST THAT THE COURT DISMISS THE CASE,; RETAINING JURISDICTION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT.; REQUEST GRANTED.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLED/COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER CHELSEA DEVORE 13842; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT.; ATTORNEY EDRIN SHAMTOB APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT NOTES A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WAS PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 12-18-14.; DEFENSE COUNSEL REPRESENTS SETTLEMENT HAS NOT BEEN FULLY EXECUTED YET.; THE COURT SETS TRIAL DATES; HOWEVER, IF A DISMISSAL IS FILED BEFORE THE TRIAL READINESS; DATE, THE TRIAL DATES WILL BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 09/08/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; FOR TRIAL BEGINNING 09/12/16.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENSE TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD M. GHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL CALLON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/25/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER DAWN JORDAN 12873; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD GHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL CALLON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS THAT PARTIES HAVE SETTLED AND ARE WAITING FOR ESCROW TO CLOSE ON A; PROPERTY LOCATED IN GLENDORA.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 05/26/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26; IF DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED. IF NO APPEARANCE IS; MADE COURT WILL DISMISS THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE AT THAT TIME.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT L CARMEN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY TOM TRAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY TOM TRAN FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INDICATES THAT THE SALE OF THE GLENDORA PROPERTY HAS NOT BEEN COMPLETED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; THE COURT NOTES THAT IF THE SALE HAS NOT BEEN COMPLETED BY THE CONTINUANCE DATE, THIS MATTER; WILL BE DISMISSED AND THE COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION FOR AN ADDTIONAL SIX MONTHS .; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/12/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY MAUREEN FRANKLIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT S LOVE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD GHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; THE COURT IS ADVISED HAS NOT BEEN SOLD YET. MATTER IS RESET AS STATED BELOW.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/15/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • FILE RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO CAL PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KERENDIAN & ASSOCIATES.; Minutes; Receipt: 121011-0301 $435.00; 121011-0301-VS Reference Number 025-0046304791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JOSEPH MICHAEL FRANKLIN SERVED ON 08/17/12 WITH FEES OF $70.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • ADA MEMO ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 120813-0443 $435.00; 120813-0443-CK Reference Number 3515

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less