This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 13:38:50 (UTC).

FRANCISCO -V- ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 FRANCISCO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST MARY MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garza, Thomas S. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1530

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Garza, Thomas S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JESSIE FRANCISCO

JESSIE FRANCISCO AN INCAPACITATED PERSON

Defendants

MOHAMMADREZA SAMADANI, M.D.

NOEL C. BERNALES, M.D.

HOSAMELDIN H MADKOUR, M.D.

ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER,

MOHAMMAD REZA SAMADANI MD

HOSPITALIST MEDICINE PHYSICIANS OF CALIFORN

SOUND INPATIENT PHYSICIANS MEDICAL

HOSPITALIST MEDICINE PHYSICIANS OF CA, INC.

SABRY, HALA HAZEM, DO

ALCONCEL, FRANKLIN, DO

ADVINCULA NP, SAMUEL

ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Not Yet Classified

CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS MEDICAL

MOHAMMADREZA SAMADANI MD

HOSPITALIST MEDICINE PHYSICIANS OF

SOUND INPATIENT PHYSICIANS MEDICAL GROUP,

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE G FAGEL & ASSOCIATES

Attorney at Bruce G Fagel & Associates

100 N Crescent Drive Suite 360

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

WALKER & MANN LLP

10832 Laurel Street Suite 204

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

DAVIS, GRASS, GOLDSTEIN & FINLAY

3105 Sedona Court

Ontario, CA 91764

BEAM, BROBECK, WEST,BORGES,,ROSA & DOUVILLE

1301 Dove Street Ste 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

R.J. RYAN LAW, APC

500 North Brand Boulevard Suite 950

Glendale, CA 91203

KJAR, MCKENNA & STOCKALPER, LLP

Attorney at KJAR, MCKENNA & STOCKALPER, LLP

West Borges & Rosa LLP

Attorney at West Borges & Rosa LLP

 

Court Documents

Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

03/26/2021: Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

03/24/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

**CV - Portal Minute Order

03/23/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Motion re:

02/05/2021: Motion re:

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

01/29/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/29/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

01/28/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

01/26/2021: Dismissal Filed as to Defendant

**CV - Portal Minute Order

12/24/2020: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Amended Document Filed re:

12/04/2020: Amended Document Filed re:

Notice Filed

12/04/2020: Notice Filed

Declaration Filed

12/04/2020: Declaration Filed

Notice Filed

11/24/2020: Notice Filed

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JES

11/09/2020: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY JES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BRUCE G FAGEL & ASSOC

08/17/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BRUCE G FAGEL & ASSOC

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER,

08/14/2020: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER,

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

08/06/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

08/04/2020: NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Original Type: Readiness Calendar; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocument is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):; Comment: dismissal case has already been dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: Motion to Relieve the Guradian Ad Litem of Her Duties and To Release Settlement Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Filed as to Defendant; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Garza, Thomas S; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court-Ordered - Before Trial; Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketReturn to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    Read MoreRead Less
376 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2017
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $10,030.01; Total Payments and Credits: $10,030.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • FinancialJESSIE FRANCISCO AN INCAPACITATED PERSON; Total Financial Assessment: $90.00; Total Payments and Credits: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketAdvanced Jury Fees Posted; Comment: ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JESSIE FRANCISCO. 171031-0208-CK JFN/ 150.00 PAYMT 171031-0208-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 448187

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 171031-0202-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 171031-0202-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 448187

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketNo Summons Issued; Comment: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JESSIE FRANCISCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hospitalist Medicine Physicians of California, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS MEDICAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant