This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:14:52 (UTC).

FRANCISCA A RECIO DE GARCIA -N- EDUARDO S GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 FRANCISCA A RECIO DE GARCIA -N- EDUARDO S GARCIA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8626

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FRANCISCA ADRIANA RECIO DE GARCIA

Respondent

EDUARDO SANTANA GARCIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/01/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF FRANCISCA RECIO DE GARCIA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF FRANCISCA RECIO DE GARCIA ORDERED ENTERED 12/22/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY FRANCISCA ADRIANA RECIO DE GARCIA FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON EDUARDO SANTANA GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST EDUARDO SANTANA GARCIA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF FRANCISCA RECIO DE GARCIA AS TO EDUARDO SANTANA GARCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDUARDO SANTANA GARCIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS/PETITION BY EDUARDO SANTANA GARCIA WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/31/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY FRANCISCA ADRIANA RECIO DE GARCIA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON FRANCISCA ADRIANA RECIO DE GARCIA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY FRANCISCA ADRIANA RECIO DE GARCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY FRANCISCA ADRIANA RECIO DE GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less